David M. Semas et al v. Chemetall US, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David M. Semas and Metalast, Inc.
Defendant: Miles Chemical Company, Ronatec C2C, Chemetall US, Inc., BASF Corporation, Electroplating Consultants International, Does 1-10, inclusive, Broco Products, Inc., Qualichem Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Albemarle Corporation, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc and Dubois Chemicals, Inc.
Intervenor: Chemeon Surface Technology
Case Number: 3:2019cv00125
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boyle, James)
April 18, 2019 Filing 123 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Benjamin Nichols Simler is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DRM) Modified on 4/23/2019 ISSUED IN ERROR (WJ).
April 18, 2019 Filing 122 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Marc Y. Lazo is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DRM)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER approving ECF No. #117 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Benjamin N. Simler and approving Designation of Local Counsel Robert C. Ryan. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER approving ECF No. #116 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Adam A. Hubbard and approving Designation of Local Counsel Robert C. Ryan. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER approving ECF No. #115 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Teague I. Donahey and approving Designation of Local Counsel Robert C. Ryan. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 17, 2019 Filing 119 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Attorney Marc Y. Lazo has submitted a motion for permission to practice pro hac vice - verified petition (ECF No. #118 .) Mr. Lazo is directed to file, under seal, an affidavit and documents relating to the answer he provided on page 2, paragraph 5 of the petition by 4/30/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 16, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc Y. Lazo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James D. Boyle (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5509139) by Plaintiff David M. Semas. (Boyle, James)
April 16, 2019 Filing 117 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin N. Simler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert C. Ryan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5508999) by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Ryan, Robert)
April 16, 2019 Filing 116 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam A. Hubbard and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert C. Ryan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5508976) by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Ryan, Robert)
April 16, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Teague I. Donahey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert C. Ryan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5508905) by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Ryan, Robert)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting ECF No. #112 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anderson L. Cao for Albemarle Corporation and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting ECF No. #111 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by R. Andrew Patty II for Albemarle Corporation and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 12, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anderson L. Cao and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rew R. Goodenow (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5504162) by Defendant Albemarle Corporation. (Goodenow, Rew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 111 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by R. Andrew Patty II and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rew R. Goodenow (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5504131) by Defendant Albemarle Corporation. (Goodenow, Rew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to #91 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Albemarle Corporation. (Goodenow, Rew)
April 10, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #89 Motion for Attorney Fees, #108 Reply, by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lukas, Timothy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to #89 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lukas, Timothy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to #87 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Lukas, Timothy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to #86 Motion to Intervene by Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Donahey, Teague) (Lukas, Timothy) Modified on 4/10/2019 to reflect Lukas filed the document (WJ).
April 4, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE to #91 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. Replies due by 4/11/2019. (Boyle, James)
April 4, 2019 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #102 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
April 4, 2019 Filing 103 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #101 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (WJ)
April 3, 2019 Filing 102 DECLARATION of David M. Semas re #100 Response, #97 Response, #99 Response, #98 Response by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Boyle, James) Modified on 4/4/2019 add links to motions #86 #87 #88 #89 (WJ).
April 3, 2019 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Michael D. Hoy re #100 Response, #99 Response, #97 Response, #98 Response by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Boyle, James) Modified on 4/4/2019 add links to motions #86 #87 #88 #89 (WJ).
April 3, 2019 Filing 100 RESPONSE to #88 Motion to Stay Case by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. Replies due by 4/10/2019. (Boyle, James)
April 3, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE to #87 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. Replies due by 4/10/2019. (Boyle, James)
April 3, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE to #89 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. Replies due by 4/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Boyle, James)
April 3, 2019 Filing 97 RESPONSE to #86 Motion to Intervene by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. Replies due by 4/10/2019. (Boyle, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * complaint* in this action was filed on* 11/19/2018.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Dubois Chemicals, Inc. and Miles Chemical Company.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 5/2/2019. (WJ)
April 1, 2019 Filing 95 WITHDRAWAL of #65 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Ronatec C2C. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 29, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James D. Boyle on behalf of Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Boyle, James)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting ECF No. #85 Motion to Substitute Attorney : Attorney Rew R. Goodenow in the place and stead of Attorneys Adam S. Hamburg and Dhruv M. Sharma for Defendant Albermarle Corporation. (Attorneys Adam S Hamburg and Dhruv M. Sharma terminated.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 3/25/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 3/26/2019 to include Attorney Sharma terminated (DRM).
March 21, 2019 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albemarle Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Goodenow, Rew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Albemarle Corporation. Responses due by 4/4/2019. (Goodenow, Rew)
March 20, 2019 Filing 90 DECLARATION re #89 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits and Exhibit A) (Lukas, Timothy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. Responses due by 4/3/2019. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. Responses due by 4/3/2019. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. Responses due by 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits and Exhibit 1) (Lukas, Timothy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rew R. Goodenow in for Attorney Adam S. Hamburg and Dhruv M. Sharma by Defendant Albemarle Corporation. (Goodenow, Rew)
March 18, 2019 Filing 84 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF Nos. #72 Reassignment Order and 79 Amended Minute Order, addressed to Marc Y. Lazo. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 79 Amended Order NEF) (LH)
March 15, 2019 Filing 83 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #78 Order, addressed to Marc Y. Lazo. (LH)
March 15, 2019 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #16 . Attorney Marc Y. Lazo is advised to review and update his user account information. Quality Control Clerk has updated your address on the docket sheet, however your attorney cm/ecf account will still need to be updated with the correct address. Please complete as soon as possible. (no image attached) (BLG)
March 14, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert C. Ryan on behalf of Defendant Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc. (Ryan, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 80 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF Nos. 74 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP, 73 Standing Order, 75 Minute Order, addressed to Marc Y. Lazo. (LH)
March 11, 2019 Filing 79 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/6/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. This matter has been transferred to the District of Nevada. It is ordered that all motions filed prior to the transfer (ECF Nos. #21 , #22 , #26 , #31 , #44 , #47 ) are denied without prejudice, subject to refiling, if counsel deem appropriate, within 15 days. If counsel choose to refile the motions, they must comply with Local Rules 7-2 and 7-3. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting ECF No. #77 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. #16 Amended Complaint. Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc.'s answer/response due by 3/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 7, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #16 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 6, 2019 Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 3/6/2019 : Stipulation to extend time (ECF No. #29 ) is GRANTED. Stipulation to continue hearing (ECF No. #58 is DENIED as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/6/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. This matter has been transferred to the District of Nevada. It is ordered that all motions filed prior to the transfer (ECF Nos. #21 , #26 , #31 , #44 , #47 ) are denied without prejudice, subject to refiling, if counsel deem appropriate, within 15 days. If counsel choose to refile the motions, they must comply with Local Rules 7-2 and 7-3. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 6, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mark Y. Lazo, Adam A. Hubbard, Teague I. Donahey, Benjamin Nichols Simler, Adam S. Hamburg, and Dhruv M. Sharma are directed to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/20/2019. Any motion to withdraw as counsel and/or to substitute Nevada counsel is due by 4/20/2019. (no image attached) (PAV)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STANDING ORDER.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/6/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that Case No. 3:19-cv-00125-LRH-CBC is reassigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry, and all future pleadings must bear case number 3:19-cv-00125-MMD-CBC. The Clerk is directed to change the file and docket to reflect this reassignment. Signed by Judges Miranda M. Du and Larry R. Hicks on 3/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 4, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:15-cv-294 by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Amended) (Lukas, Timothy)
March 4, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronatec C2C. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lukas, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronatec C2C that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 68 JOINDER to #26 Motion for Attorney Fees,, by Defendant Ronatec C2C. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 67 JOINDER to #22 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Ronatec C2C. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert C. Ryan on behalf of Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Ryan, Robert)
March 1, 2019 Filing 65 WITHDRAWN PER ECF NO #95 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc.,. Ronatec C2C, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. Responses due by 3/15/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/15/2019. (Lukas, Timothy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 3/1/2019 to reflect correct filing party. (BLG). Modified on 4/1/2019 (WJ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Related Case by BASF Corporation, Chemeon Surface Technology, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy A. Lukas on behalf of Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Lukas, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
March 1, 2019 Filing 62 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:18-cv-02073 with documents 1-61 received electronically . Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (LH)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) GRANTING Motion to Transfer (Doc. #22 ); (2) DECLINING to Address and VACATING Hearings on other Motions (Docs. #21 , #26 , #31 , #44 , #47 ); and (3) DENYING Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Hearings (Doc. #59 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Moving Defendants Motion is GRANTED as to TRANSFER of this case to the District of Nevada, Reno Division. The Court declines to address the Motion as to dismissal or stay of this action in light of the Nevada Action; such determinations may be made by the transferee court. Similarly, the Court declines to address all other pending motions and VACATES the hearings thereon. Defendants Ex Parte Application to Continue and Consolidate Hearings is DENIED AS MOOT. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). Case transferred electronically. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 27, 2019 ***Motions terminated: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendants Broco Products, Inc. and Electroplating Consultants International, Inc., based on Notice of Dismissal #50 filed 2/15/2019. (tg) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #58 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2019, is continued from 3/8/2019, until such time as set by the Court after all parties have appeared and the Court has decided the Motion to Intervene and all Motions to Dismiss, Or, in the Alternative, to Transfer or Stay. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 59 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue hearings from March 1, 2019 and April 5, 2019 to April 19, 2019 or as soon thereafter as the court may hear the matters Re: Joinder (Motion Related) #48 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 , Joinder (Motion Related) #33 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Qualichem Inc. #31 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by defendants and proposed intervenor BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemeon Surface Technology, Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler added to party Broco Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler added to party Electroplating Consultants International(pty:dft)) (Simler, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 58 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from March 8, 2019 to a date to be set by the Court Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #27 filed by defendants and proposed intervenor BASF Corporation, Chemeon Surface Technology, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler added to party BASF Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler added to party Chemeon Surface Technology(pty:intv), Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler added to party Chemetall US, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler added to party John Schneider and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Simler, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 18, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. correcting Reply (Motion related), #54 (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 ***Defendants Broco Products, Inc. (an Ohio corporation) and Electroplating Consultants International (an Oklahoma corporation) are terminated. Per Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1), (Dkt No. #50 . (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 56 Opposition In Opposition to Qualichem's Joinder re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Simler)(Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 54 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Lukas)(Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 53 OBJECTION support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party John Schneider and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Qualichem Inc.(pty:dft))(Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Qualichem Inc., Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technologyto Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #39 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #37 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #43 (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #21 filed by Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (without prejudice) as to Broco Products, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant John Schneider and Associates, Inc., identifying H. Stephen Schneider. (Hubbard, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 48 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 filed by Defendant John Schneider and Associates, Inc.. (Hubbard, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant John Schneider and Associates, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of H. Stephen Schneider, #3 Declaration Declaration of Benjamin N. Simler, #4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Adam A Hubbard added to party John Schneider and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Hubbard, Adam) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #44 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 45 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The hearing on Defendant Albemarle Corporation's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #44 , is CONTINUED from 3/15/2019 to 4/19/2019 at 10:30 a.m. REMINDER: Prior to filing any motion, counsel are required to view the Court's Closed Motion Dates found under Judges' Procedures and Schedules on the Court's web site. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Albemarle Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sharma, Dhruv) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 43 Evidentiary Objection In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 (to Declaration of Robert Ryan) filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 42 Opposition In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to M. Lazo Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to M. Lazo Declaration)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Michael D. Hoy In Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibiit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION of David Semas In Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #21 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 39 Evidentiary Objection In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 (to Declaration of T. Ventresca) filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 38 Opposition In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 37 Evidentiary Objection In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #21 (to Declaration of D. Meiling) filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 36 Opposition In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #21 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #21 (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Development in Related Nevada Case filed by Defendants and Intervenor BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemeon Surface Technology, Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, Qualichem Inc.. (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 33 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #26 filed by Defendant Qualichem Inc.. (Simler, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Qualichem Inc., identifying Yushiro Manufacturing America, Inc.; Yushiro Inc.. (Simler, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant Qualichem Inc. filed by defendant Qualichem Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Dennis Butts, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Benjamin Nichols Simler added to party Qualichem Inc.(pty:dft)) (Simler, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 ***Terminate Motion - clean up utility only as to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 2/11/2019 re Amended Complaint #16 #28 . Pursuant to Notice of Withdrawal (Dkt No. #30 ). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 ***Attorney Adam S Hamburg for Defendant Albemarle Corporation added. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Albemarle Corporation. (Docket No. 28) (Sharma, Dhruv) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Albemarle Corporation answer now due 2/11/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Albemarle Corporation.(Sharma, Dhruv) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 28 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 2/11/2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Albemarle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Proof of Service, #7 Proposed Order) (Attorney Dhruv M Sharma added to party Albemarle Corporation(pty:dft)) (Sharma, Dhruv) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 3/8/2019 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (tg) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Intervenor and Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemeon Surface Technology, Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Bob Ryan, #3 Declaration of Teague Donahey) (Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Chemetall US, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Intervenor and Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemeon Surface Technology, Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International. Related Case(s): 3:15-cv-00294-MMD-CBC (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology identifying Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Broco Products, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Jeff Guernsey, #3 Declaration of Stephen Brown) (Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Broco Products, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Electroplating Consultants International(pty:dft)) (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Intervenor and Defendant BASF Corporation, Chemeon Surface Technology. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Teague Donahey, #3 Declaration of Ted Ventresca) (Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party BASF Corporation(pty:dft)) (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Chemeon Surface Technology. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Dean Meiling) (Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Chemeon Surface Technology(pty:intv)) (Donahey, Teague) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 21 DAYS Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #16 as to Defendants Albemarle Corporation, BASF Corporation, Broco Products, Inc., Chemetall US, Inc., Dubois Chemicals, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Miles Chemical Company, Qualichem Inc., Ronatec C2C, Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #16 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the First Amended Complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #16 filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Broco Products, Inc., Electroplating Consultants International, Ronatec C2C. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants BASF Corporation, Chemetall US, Inc., Dubois Chemicals, Inc., John Schneider and Associates, Inc., Miles Chemical Company, Qualichem Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 21, 2018 ***Set Flag(s): (KESx). DISCOVERY. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott added. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 19, 2018 ***Party Does 1-10, inclusive added. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas, (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22769410 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Metalast, Inc., David M. Semas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Marc Y Lazo added to party Metalast, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Marc Y Lazo added to party David M. Semas(pty:pla))(Lazo, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 3/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David M. Semas et al v. Chemetall US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronatec C2C
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemetall US, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Benjamin Nichols Simler
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: Adam A. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Benjamin Nichols Simler
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: Adam A. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electroplating Consultants International
Represented By: Benjamin Nichols Simler
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broco Products, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Nichols Simler
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualichem Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Benjamin Nichols Simler
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: Adam A. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Schneider and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Adam A. Hubbard
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Benjamin Nichols Simler
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albemarle Corporation
Represented By: Dhruv M Sharma
Represented By: Adam S Hamburg
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Represented By: Anderson L. Ceo
Represented By: Randel Andrew Patty, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Industrial Chemicals, Inc
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dubois Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Chemeon Surface Technology
Represented By: Robert C. Ryan
Represented By: Benjamin Nichols Simler
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Represented By: Adam A. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Semas
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Clark V Vellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metalast, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Y. Lazo
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?