Lawrence v. County of Elko et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Douglas Lawrence
Defendant: John C. Carpenter, Elko County Sheriff's Office, Aitor Narvaiza, Medallus Medical Care and Elko, County of
Case Number: 3:2019cv00284
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDMENT to Relief Requested, by Plaintiff Nathan Douglas Lawrence. (KR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address, by Plaintiff Nathan Douglas Lawrence. Old: 1313302, Elko County Jail, 775 W Silver St, Elko, NV 89801. New: NNCC. (KR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Nathan Douglas Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KR)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk shall send Plaintiff the approved IFP form and instructions (Mailed to P on 6/3/2019); Fully complete inmate account statement or $400 filing fee due by 7/3/2019; if Plaintiff fails to timely file an inmate account statement, the Court will dismiss the case, without prejudice, for Plaintiff to file a new case when he is able to acquire the necessary documents to file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nathan Douglas Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Letter)(LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. County of Elko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elko County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aitor Narvaiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medallus Medical Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elko, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Douglas Lawrence
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?