Quaintance v Herb Hallman Chevrolet
Petitioner: Gary A. Quaintance
Respondent: Herb Hallman Chevrolet and Jack Stanko
Case Number: 3:2019cv00340
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #17 Order, addressed to Richard Bruce Herman. (LH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. #16 Order, addressed to Richard Bruce Herman. (LH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Richard Bruce Herman is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 7/29/2019 COMPLIED (WJ).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Petitioner's Ex Parte Emergency Motion to Shorten Time on Petition for Order to Perpetuate Testimony by Deposition Before Action, Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 27(a), re ECF No. #15 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving ECF No. #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard B. Herman on behalf of Petitioner Gary A. Quaintance and approving Designation of Local Counsel Raelene K. Palmer. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/24/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #2 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony by Petitioner Gary A. Quaintance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Revised [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Emergency Motion to Shorten Time on Petition for Order to Perpetuate Testimony by Deposition Before Action, Pursuant to FRCP 27(a)) (Palmer, Raelene)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard B. Herman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Raelene K. Palmer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5598096) by Petitioner Gary A. Quaintance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Palmer, Raelene)
June 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Distirct Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE that this case, formerly Misc Case No. 3:19-ms-0007, having become a contested proceeding on 06/20/2019, has been converted to the regular civil docket and has been assigned case number 3:19-cv-0340. All future pleadings must be filed in the civil action and must bear said civil case number. (LE)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Karen Walker; Pla Counsel: Ralene K. Palmer, Esq.; Richard Herman, Esq.; Def Counsel: David Houston, Esq.; Vicky Oldenburg, Esq.; Court Reporter: Liberty Court Recorder; Time of Hearing: 9:05 a.m.-9:29 a.m.; Recording start and end times: 9:05 a.m.-9:29 a.m.; Courtroom: 2; The court holds today's hearing on Petitioner's Petition to Perpetuate Testimony of Gary A. Quaintance #1 . IT IS ORDERED that Petition to Perpetuate Testimony of Gary A. Quaintance is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Palmer revise the proposed order and have opposing counsel review the order prior to submission to the court. If there is any dispute as to the content of the proposed order allowing the perpetuation of M. Quaintance's testimony, counsel is to immediately contact the court to have another hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel meet and confer with Ms. Palmer, pursuant to Local Rules, to identify any documents to be produced prior to Mr. Quaintance's deposition. See attached Minutes for further details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 ERRATA to #10 Reply by Petitioner Gary A. Quaintance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email) (Palmer, Raelene)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony, #7 Response, by Petitioner Gary A. Quaintance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Email) (Palmer, Raelene)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #7 . Attorney Victoria T. Oldenburg is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David R. Houston on behalf of Respondent Herb Hallman Chevrolet d/b/a Chamption Chevrolet Jack Stanko. (Houston, David) Modified on 6/19/2019 to reflect a different respondent. (WJ).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony by Respondent Herb Hallman Chevrolet d/b/a Chamption Chevrolet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement 1 page, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Victoria T. Oldenburg 1 page) (Oldenburg, Victoria)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #2 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by In Re Gary A. Quaintance. (Palmer, Raelene)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/14/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Karen Walker. A Motion Hearing set is for Thursday, 6/20/2019 at 9:00 A.M. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-888-557-8511, enter theaccess code 3599743, and enter the security code 62019, approximately five (5)minutes prior to the hearing. The Court will address ECF No. #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony and any related briefing. Responses to ECF No. #1 Petition will be due by 12:00 P.M. on 6/19/2019. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 6/17/2019 to correct typo (KW).
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:19-ms-0007-WGC. (no image attached) (WJ)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 6/14/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Wayne Julian. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry recuses himself/herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 EMERGENCY MOTION to Shorten Time re ECF No. #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony as to Deposition of Gary A. Quaintance. (DRM) Modified on 6/13/2019 to reflect emergency motion. (WJ).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Perpetuate Testimony of Gary A. Quaintance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRM) Modified on 6/13/2019 to reflect Filing Fee $47.00 PAID; Receipt No. NVRNO-004599 (DRM).
June 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quaintance v Herb Hallman Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Herb Hallman Chevrolet
Represented By: David R. Houston
Represented By: Victoria T. Oldenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jack Stanko
Represented By: David R. Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary A. Quaintance
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Represented By: Richard Bruce Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?