All Filters, Inc. et al v. Captain's Compass, LLC
Plaintiff: WJB, LLC and All Filters, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Captain's Compass, LLC and Erpia, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00364
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, filed by All Filters, Inc., All Filters, Inc., All Filters, Inc., WJB, LLC, WJB, LLC, WJB, LLC.(Francis, Matthew) Modified on 8/23/2019 clarify entry to reflect what was filed and to what. (WJ).
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Tiffany A. Blofield is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Tiffany A. Blofield on behalf of Captain's Compass, LLC and ERPIA, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bethany L. Rabe. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/7/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany A. Blofield and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bethany L. Rabe (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5653836) by Third Party Plaintiffs Captain's Compass, LLC, Erpia, LLC, Defendant Captain's Compass, LLC, Counter Claimants Captain's Compass, LLC, Erpia, LLC. (Rabe, Bethany)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Captain's Compass, LLC, Captain's Compass, LLC, Captain's Compass, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Vero Ventures, LLC for Captain's Compass, LLC, Captain's Compass, LLC, Captain's Compass, LLC added. (Rabe, Bethany)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Erpia, LLC, Erpia, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Vero Ventures, LLC for Erpia, LLC, Erpia, LLC added. (Rabe, Bethany)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Tiffany A. Blofield to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/20/2019. (no image attached) (WJ)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/19/2019.), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT by Erpia, LLC against All Filters, Inc., WJB, LLC by Captain's Compass, LLC, Erpia, LLC., COUNTERCLAIM against All Filters, Inc., WJB, LLC by Captain's Compass, LLC, Erpia, LLC. filed by Captain's Compass, LLC, Erpia, LLC.(Rabe, Bethany) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Answer/response due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Captain's Compass, LLC. (Tratos, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Filters, Inc., WJB, LLC. Captain's Compass, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Francis, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (DRM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Captain's Compass, LLC. (DRM)
June 28, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 28, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by All Filters, Inc., WJB, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Blaine Wimsatt for All Filters, Inc., WJB, LLC added. (Francis, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Captain's Compass, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5606166) by All Filters, Inc., WJB, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Francis, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Filters, Inc. et al v. Captain's Compass, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WJB, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Francis
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Filters, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D Francis
Represented By: Arthur A Zorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Captain's Compass, LLC
Represented By: Bethany Rabe
Represented By: Tiffany Blofield
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Erpia, LLC
Represented By: Bethany Rabe
Represented By: Tiffany Blofield
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?