Doiel v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Neva Doiel
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Kroger Dedicated Logistics
Case Number: 3:2019cv00390
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. Replies due by 9/13/2019. (Busby, Jerry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Neva Doiel. (Osborne, Stephen)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Neva Doiel. Responses due by 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 EX 1, #2 EX 2) (Osborne, Stephen)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRM)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No. #6 Proposed Order : Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Motions due by 5/27/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. (Busby, Jerry)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Busby, Jerry)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/12/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/27/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 11, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV19-00828, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5619462) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Busby, Jerry) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doiel v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neva Doiel
Represented By: Stephen H. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Dedicated Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?