United States of America v. $318,360.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $318,360.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00393
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property Issued as to $318,360.00 in United States Currency. (LH)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property and Notice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Blum, James)
July 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN FORFEITURE against $318,360.00 in United States Currency by United States of America. Proof of service due by 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blum, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $318,360.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $318,360.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James Alexander Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?