Murray v. Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC
Plaintiff: Patrick Murray
Defendant: Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00399
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Dennis O'Keefe for Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC added. (Rezac, Molly)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/13/2019.(Rezac, Molly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand. Response due August 29, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/7/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC. (Rezac, Molly)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Murray re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Mausert, Mark)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Patrick Murray. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mausert, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada LLC re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KR)
July 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for ENE. (LE)
July 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5624848) by Patrick Murray. Proof of service due by 10/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Mausert, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Gate Petroleum of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Molly Malone Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Murray
Represented By: Mark L. Mausert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?