Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC v. Alanddon LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC
Defendant: Alanddon LLC, Valarie M Lehr, Allan G Fiegehen, Donald A Lehr and Kristine A Fiegehen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00449
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Defendant Allan G Fiegehen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Russell, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alanddon LLC, Allan G Fiegehen, Donald A Lehr, Valarie M Lehr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Russell, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Alanddon LLC, Allan G Fiegehen, Donald A Lehr, Valarie M Lehr. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/3/2019.(Russell, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Stipulation : Defendants should answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before Thursday, September 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint: Order by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Zimmer, Ryan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Allan G Fiegehen served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Zimmer, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Valarie Lehr re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Hayes, Griffith)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Donald Lehr re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Hayes, Griffith)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Alanddon LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. (Hayes, Griffith)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Donald A. Lehr, #2 Valerie M. Lehr, #3 Allan G. Fiegehen, #4 Kristine A. Fiegehen) (DRM)
August 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Western Refining Southwest, Inc, Corporate Parent Giant Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Western Refining, Inc., Corporate Parent Andeavor LLC, Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC added. (Hayes, Griffith)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5648017) by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC. Proof of service due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - Alanddon LLC, #3 Summons Summons - Donald A Lehr, #4 Summons Summons - Valerie M Lehr, #5 Summons Summons - Allan G Fiegehen, #6 Summons Summons - Kristine A Fiegehen)(Hayes, Griffith) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC v. Alanddon LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alanddon LLC
Represented By: Ryan D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valarie M Lehr
Represented By: Ryan D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan G Fiegehen
Represented By: Ryan D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald A Lehr
Represented By: Ryan D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine A Fiegehen
Represented By: Ryan D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC
Represented By: Griffith H Hayes
Represented By: Ryan Benjamin Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?