King-Hardiman v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: Andre King-Hardiman
Respondent: Gittere and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv00484
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Andre King-Hardiman. (LH)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED - IFP Application or $5.00 filing fee due by 9/29/2019. Clerk shall send P blank IFP form. (Form and instructions mailed to P at ESP on 8/15/2019.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Gittere, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00484. (DRM)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE - No IFP Application or Fling Fee was Received with Initiating Documents on behalf of Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Motion for Counsel, #3 Notice of Appeal) (DRM)
August 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King-Hardiman v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andre King-Hardiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?