WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. v. Data Conversions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. and WAG Acquisitions, LLC
Defendant: WMM Holdings LLC, DATA CONVERSIONS, INC. and WMM, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00489
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 202 ADDENDUM to #193 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff WAG Acquisitions, LLC, Counter Defendant WAG Acquisitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wilt, Allen)
October 3, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen J Wilt on behalf of Plaintiff WAG Acquisitions, LLC, Counter Defendant WAG Acquisitions, LLC. (Wilt, Allen)
October 3, 2019 Filing 200 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/3/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Joint Status Report due by 10/17/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER approving ECF No. #193 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ari J. Jaffess on behalf of WAG Acquisitions, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Elizabeth J. Bassett. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting ECF No. #192 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David G. Liston for WAG Acquisitions LLC, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting ECF No. #191 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alex G. Patchen for WAG Acquisitions LLC, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting ECF No. #190 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Abramson for WAG Acquisitions LLC, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting ECF No. #189 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mord Michael Lewis for WAG Acquisitions LLC, and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 30, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Liane K Wakayama on behalf of Counter Claimants WMM Holdings LLC, WMM, LLC, Defendants WMM Holdings LLC, WMM, LLC. (Wakayama, Liane)
September 30, 2019 Filing 193 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ari J. Jaffess and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Elizabeth J. Bassett (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5720337) by Plaintiff WAG Acquisitions, LLC, Counter Defendant WAG Acquisitions, LLC. (Bassett, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 192 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David G. Liston and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Elizabeth J. Bassett (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5720329) by Plaintiff WAG Acquisitions, LLC, Counter Defendant WAG Acquisitions, LLC. (Bassett, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 191 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alex G. Patchen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Elizabeth J. Bassett (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5720319) by Plaintiff WAG Acquisitions, LLC, Counter Defendant WAG Acquisitions, LLC. (Bassett, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 190 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Abramson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Elizabeth J. Bassett (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5720309) by Plaintiff WAG Acquisitions, LLC, Counter Defendant WAG Acquisitions, LLC. (Bassett, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2019 Filing 189 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mord Michael Lewis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Elizabeth J. Bassett (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5720244) by Plaintiff WAG Acquisitions, LLC, Counter Defendant WAG Acquisitions, LLC. (Bassett, Elizabeth)
August 15, 2019 Filing 188 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 15, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ari Jason Jaffess to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Todd Matthew Nosher to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ralph A. Dengler to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael James Gesualdo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Justin Taylor Quinn to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 182 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Frank M. Gasparo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 181 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Andrew P. MacArthur to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 180 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gianna Ellissa Cricco-Lizza to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 179 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mord Michael Lewis to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 178 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Alex G. Patchen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ronald Abramson to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached) (LE)
August 15, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David G. Liston to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/29/2019. (no image attached)
August 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (LE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 175 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:14-cv-02345. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received with documents numbered 1-174, received electronically. (DRM)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #160 Report and Recommendations ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (vm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 173 OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 08/13/2019. (vm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 172 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #171 Order. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by March 28, 2019, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint status report, etc. There will be a telephone status conference in these matters on April 23, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/14/2019. (ys, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER granting #168 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/7/2019. (gl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW & ORDER granting #167 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/7/2019. (gl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #167 MOTION to Seal Document #161 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, #166 Response (NOT Motion),, , #168 MOTION to Seal Document #160 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. . Motion(s) set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (gl, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION to Seal Document #160 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 167 MOTION to Seal Document #161 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, #166 Response (NOT Motion),, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Objections to Report & Recommendation, #3 Redacted Response to Objections, #4 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #5 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #6 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 166 RESPONSE re #161 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 179 Motion to Seal, 175 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in case 2:14-cv-2340-ES-MAH, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.; Any renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than December 14, 2018, etc. re #164 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/26/2018. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #164 MOTION to Seal Document #160 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 164 MOTION to Seal Document #160 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Version of Document to be Sealed, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting WAG Acquisition, LLC an 8-day extension to file its Response to Defendants' Objections to Judge Hammer's 10/23/2018 Report and Recommendation until 11/28/2018. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/20/2018. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 162 Letter from Ronald Abramson re Unopposed Request for Extension to File Response re #161 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 161 OBJECTION to #160 Report and Recommendations by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 160 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Objections, if any, to R&R due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/22/2018. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 LETTER ORDER terminating Defendants' #148 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, or alternatively, to dismiss for improper venue, or to transfer, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 6/29/2018. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument Conference held on 3/28/2018. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 158 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TEXT ORDER: Oral Argument set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/28/2018. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 FINDING OF FACT CONCLUSION OF LAW AND ORDER that Plaintiff has complied with the strictures of Local Civil Rule 5.3(c) and 7.1; and it is further Ordered that Plaintiff's #155 Motion to Seal Document is hereby Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/27/2018. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 16, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #155 MOTION to Seal Document #152 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #151 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #149 Brief,,,, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION to Seal Document #152 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #151 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #149 Brief,,,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Opposition to Motion, #5 Proposed Redactions to Reply Brief in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit 11 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #7 Exhibit 12 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #8 Exhibit 13 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #9 Exhibit 14 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #10 Exhibit 16 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #11 Exhibit 17 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #12 Exhibit 18 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #13 Exhibit 20 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #14 Exhibit 21 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #15 Exhibit 22 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #16 Exhibit 23 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #17 Exhibit 24 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #18 Exhibit 26 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #19 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 LETTER ORDER Granting #153 Letter from Ronald Abramson, permitting parties a one-week extension of time, until 1/16/18, to file a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/2018. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 9, 2018 Filing 153 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 26, 2017 Filing 152 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC re #148 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 151 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #148 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 27, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #148 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC re #149 Brief,,,, #148 MOTION to Dismiss (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 149 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF NO. 148] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William F. Raines III, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER terminating without prejudice #140 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. It is further Ordered that Defendants shall make any motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter, and to dismiss or transfer for improper venue under 1406(a) on or before 11/22/2017; any opposition shall be filed by 12/19/2017 any reply shall filed by 12/26/2017, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/2/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 146 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 145 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC re #140 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 144 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing the parties Joint Claim Construction Statement. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Statement, #2 Exhibit A and B)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 143 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #140 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mord M. Lewis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 10, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the order extending deadlines attached to docket entry DKT. NO. #142 . Previous document was attach in error. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 LETTER ORDER granting parties request for an extension of Claim Construction deadlines, as set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/2017. (JB, ) (Main Document 142 replaced on 8/10/2017) (JB, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 141 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess regarding Joint Request for Extension of Claim Construction Deadlines. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #140 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Motion set for 8/21/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B (Part 1), #5 Exhibit B (Part 2), #6 Declaration of William Raines, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 139 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER, that Plaintiff has complied with the strictures of local Civil rule 5.3(c) and 7.1 and it is further Ordered that plaintiff's #129 Motion to Seal Document is hereby Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/5/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 LETTER ORDER Granting #136 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. [CORRECTING ECF No. 135] re #135 Letter, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/5/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 136 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. [CORRECTING ECF No. 135] re #135 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 135 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, USMJ. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 LETTER ORDER Granting #133 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq., requesting a three week extension for all claim construction deadlines, see chart, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/29/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 133 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting #130 Letter from Ronald Abramson regarding Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alex G. Patchen, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/12/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 131 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. raising dispute regarding TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands (May 22, 2017). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 130 Letter from Ronald Abramson regarding Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alex G. Patchen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, #2 Declaration of Alex G. Patchen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #129 MOTION to Seal Document #127 Letter,,, . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 129 MOTION to Seal Document #127 Letter,,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of David G. Liston, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted May 24, 2017 Letter, #4 Redacted Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer to May 24, 2017 Letter, #5 Appendix 1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #6 Appendix 2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #7 A1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #8 A2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #9 Redacted A3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #10 Redacted A4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #11 Redacted A5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #12 Redacted A6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #13 A7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #14 A8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #15 Redacted A9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #16 A10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #17 Redacted A11 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #18 Exhibit D1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #19 Exhibit D2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #20 Exhibit D3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #21 Redacted Ex. D4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #22 Redacted Ex. D5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #23 Redacted Ex. D6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #24 Redacted Ex. D7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #25 Exhibit D8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #26 Exhibit D9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #27 Exhibit D10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #28 Redacted Ex A (WAG), #29 Exhibit B (WAG), #30 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' May 24, 2017 letter [D.E. 127]. The parties are instructed to immediately meet and confer on the scheduling of outstanding fact depositions, and the maximum time allotted to each deposition. If they cannot reach agreement by June 7, 2017, they shall appear in the Courtroom of the Undersigned at 10:00 a.m. on June 8, 2017 to continue the meet and confer process in person. This Order applies to each of the seven matters before this Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/1/2017. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 127 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Tab - Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 A1, #5 A2, #6 A3, #7 A4, #8 A5, #9 A6, #10 A7, #11 A8, #12 A9, #13 A10, #14 A11, #15 Exhibit D1, #16 Exhibit D2, #17 Exhibit D3, #18 Exhibit D4, #19 Exhibit D5, #20 Exhibit D6, #21 Exhibit D7, #22 Exhibit D8, #23 Exhibit D9, #24 Exhibit D10, #25 Exhibit A (WAG), #26 Exhibit B (WAG))(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER FOR AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/18/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 125 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing a proposed Amended Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 5, 2017 Filing 124 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting #122 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/30/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Filing 122 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's proposed Amended Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 121 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference set for 2/24/2017 is adjourned without a new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/21/2017. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #112 Joint MOTION to Seal Document 105 Letter,, 110 Letter,, by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/4/2017. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER/LETTER Of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the March 18, 1970 Hague Convention on the taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/16. (cm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 117 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #114 Exhibit (to Document),, #112 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #105 Letter,, #110 Letter,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 116 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #115 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 115 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 114 Exhibit to #113 Letter by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 113 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 111 Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #112 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #105 Letter,, #110 Letter,, . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 112 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #105 Letter,, #110 Letter,, by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted November 3, 2016 Letter of Defendants, #4 Redacted Ex. A to November 3, 2016 Letter, #5 Redacted November 21, 2016 Letter of Plaintiff, #6 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to continue to meet and confer regarding Defendants' request that their Letter of Request be signed. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter on their own, they shall appear in the courtroom of the Undersigned on December 8, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. for an in person meet and confer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/22/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 110 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #105 Letter,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by MORD MICHAEL LEWIS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (LEWIS, MORD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 108 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #107 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 107 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess re #105 Letter,, #106 Letter. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 106 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #105 Letter,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 3, 2016 Filing 105 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 25, 2016 Filing 104 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER, AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/2016. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER that Defendants' request that the Court limit the number of claims that Plaintiff can assert is DENIED, and that Plaintiff's request that the Court limit the number of prior art references by Defendants is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/2016. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 101 Joint Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 7, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/7/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel for plaintiff will initiate the call to 973-776-7858. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/30/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2016 Text Only Minute Entry for an oral opinion placed on the record re #74 Motion to Bifurcate by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2016. See order #99 . (jqb, ) Modified on 9/30/2016 (jqb, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #74 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2016. (JB, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is cancelled. A new date and time for the call will be scheduled shortly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is adjourned to Wednesday, August 3, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/29/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 95 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 27, 2016 Filing 98 Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on July 15, 2016, before Judge Michael Hammer. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2016. (mfr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument held on 7/15/2016 re #74 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery filed by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. Decision Reserved. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall forthwith continue to meet & confer in an attempt to resolve the issue raised in their June 23, 2016 letter to the Court. There will be a telephone conference call with counsel on July 29, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. to advise the Court regarding the status of their meet & confer and this outstanding issue. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/15/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' June 23, 2016 joint letter, the Court adjourns Plaintiff's June 23, 2016 deadline to submit responses to Defendants invalidity contentions and the July 6, 2016 deadline to exchange proposed terms of construction. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the positions and arguments raised in the June 23, 2016 joint letter before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on July 15, 2016. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/5/2016. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 92 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 TEXT ORDER: There will be Oral Argument on the pending motion to bifurcate #74 on July 15, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/25/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/28/2016. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 23, 2016 Filing 89 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER: On or before March 23, 2016, the parties are directed to file a revised discovery confidentiality order consistent with the Court's rulings of March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/16. (Dunican, T) Modified on 3/10/2016 (jqb, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/9/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 7, 2016 Filing 87 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #74 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Sur-Reply) (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2016 at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting pltf's request for permission to file a sur-reply in opposition to Joint motion to bifurcate liability, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that WAG shall be permitted to file a sur-reply brief not to exceed 5 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 83 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #82 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 82 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #74 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 29, 2016 Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC re #74 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/25/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 23, 2016 Filing 79 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 73 Order,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 78 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #74 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 18, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (CRICCO-LIZZA, GIANNA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER permitting the parties an extension until 2/23/16, to comply with the Court's 2/8/16 Text Order RE: remaining disputes in the Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/17/16. (cm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 75 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #74 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. Motion set for 3/7/2016 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 74 MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' February 5, 2016 letter presenting disputes between the parties regarding the form of the Discovery Confidentiality Order. The Court directs the parties to immediately resume their efforts to meet and confer on this dispute. If the parties cannot resolve their issues, then they shall submit, by February 17, 2016, a revised letter presenting any remaining disputes. The revised joint letter also shall explain why the Court's standard Discovery Confidentiality Order (Appendix S to the New Jersey Federal Practice Rules) is insufficient. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/8/2016. (MAH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 72 Transcript of Proceedings of Scheduling Conference held on January 22, 2016, before Judge MICHAEL A. HAMMER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 5, 2016 Filing 71 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re: Discovery Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/2016. (seb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 69 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER purs. to Fed.R.Evid.502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/2016. (seb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re: E-Discovery in Patent Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/2016. (seb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 1/22/2016. (ECR)(jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 19, 2016 Filing 66 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing Joint Discovery Plan, E-Discovery Order, and Rule 502(d) Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order re: Electronic Discovery, #3 Proposed Rule 502(d) Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 22, 2015 Filing 65 ANSWER to Counterclaim by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 1, 2015 Reset Hearing: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2016 has been adjourned to 1/22/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 30, 2015 Remark: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2016 will be held at 2:30 p.m. (Time Change Only) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 30, 2015 Reset Hearing: Per counsel's request, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 has been adjourned to 1/21/2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 30, 2015 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #64 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/24/2015. (anr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 25, 2015 Filing 64 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to WAG Acquisition, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 17, 2015 Filing 63 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG re #62 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 16, 2015 Filing 62 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #59 Letter, #60 Order, Set/Clear Flags, Set Hearings. (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 16, 2015 Filing 61 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. by WMM, LLC, WMM HOLDINGS, LLC.(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/13/2015. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 12, 2015 Filing 59 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-PTAB Decision on 011 Patent, #2 Exhibit EX 2-PTAB Decision on 141 Patent, #3 Exhibit EX 3-PTAB Decision on 611 Patent, #4 Exhibit EX 4-PTAB Decision on 839 Patent)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 5, 2015 Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 26, 2015 Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC.(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING THE DATE BY WHICH DEFENDANTS MUST ANSWER THE COMPLAINT, Defendants' application is granted; Defendants shall file their answers to WAG Acquisition, L.L.C.'s Complaints by 10/26/2015. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/24/2015. (anr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 56 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendants motion to dismiss in each of the consolidated cases, the Clerk shall terminate WebPowers motion to dismiss in Civil Action No. 15-3581, D.E. No. 9, and the parties shall engage in limited jurisdictional discovery regarding the Courts personal jurisdiction over Defendant Coolvision.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/10/15. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 29, 2015 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2015 re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) filed by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter Lynne Johnson.) (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC of withdrawal of appearance (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 9, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by ARI JASON JAFFESS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 28, 2015 Set Hearings: Set Hearings: Please be advised that Oral Argument for the pending Motion to Dismiss has been scheduled for 7/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (ps, ) (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 19, 2015 Filing 51 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff re #50 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IV v. Capital One)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 50 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing Supplemental Authority re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 15, 2015 Filing 49 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. re #48 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 15, 2015 Filing 48 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 8, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 24, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 20, 2015 Filing 45 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LEDA DUNN WETTRE terminated. (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 44 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Defendants' Joint Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints) (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 43 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 to Abramson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Abramson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Abramson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Abramson Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Abramson Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Abramson Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Abramson Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Abramson Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Abramson Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Abramson Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Abramson Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Abramson Declaration, #14 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)[Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss). Motion set for 2/17/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Leonid Radvinsky, #3 Declaration of Noam Fogel, #4 Declaration of Michael A. Innes, Esq., #5 Exhibit 1 to Innes Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Innes Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Innes Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Innes Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to Innes Declaration, #10 Exhibit 6 to Innes Declaration, #11 Exhibit 7 to Innes Declaration, #12 Exhibit 8 to Innes Declaration, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/8/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 6, 2014 Filing 40 Letter from All Counsel to Judge Salas Regarding Briefing of Motions To Dismiss. (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that WAG Acquisition, L.L. C. v. Sobonito Investments, Ltd.,- et al. Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-01661 (ES)(JAD) WAG Acquisition, LLC v. Multi Media, LLC et al. Civil Action No. 2: 14-cv-02340 (ES)(JAD) WAG Acquisition, L.L. C. v. Data Conversions, Inc. et al. Civil Action No. 2: 14-cv-02345 (ES)(JAD) WAG Acquisition, L.L. C. v. Flying Crocodile, Inc. et al. Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-02674 (ES)(MAH) WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. v. Gatlyan Group S.a.r.l. et al. Civil Action No.2:14-cv-02832 (ES) (JAD) WAG Acquisition, L.L. C. v. MFCXY, Inc. et al. Civil Action No. 2: 14-cv-03 196 (ES)(MAH) WAG Acquisition, L.L. C. v. FriendFinder Networks Inc. et al. Civil Action No. 2: 14-cv-03456 (ES)(JAD) WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. v. Vubeology, Inc. et al. Civil Action No. 2 1 4-cv-0453 1 (ES)(JAD) are consolidated for discovery purposes only, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/6/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2014 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 9/29/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 24, 2014 Reset Hearings: Please be advised that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2014 has been RESCHEDULED to 11/5/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Esther Salas. A Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 9/29/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Esther Salas. Plaintiffs counsel shall coordinate the call. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 23, 2014 Filing 37 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas re #36 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 23, 2014 Filing 36 Letter from Leda Dunn Wettre, Esq. to Judge Salas. (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 23, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by JILLIAN ALEXANDRIA CENTANNI on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (CENTANNI, JILLIAN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 34 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas re Proposed Order re 33 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER. In response to docket entries 29 and 30, the Court requests that the parties provide a joint proposed order on the issues therein by no later than the close of business on Monday, September 22nd. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 9/16/2014.(ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 15, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. MACARTHUR on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (MACARTHUR, ANDREW) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER. The request to postpone the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2014 before Judge Esther Salas is hereby denied. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 9/4/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 30 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. re #29 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 29, 2014 Filing 29 Letter from Leda Wettre to Judge Salas requesting adjournment of initial conference. (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter ORDER terminating #11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/25/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 18, 2014 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/15/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2014 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. DATA CONVERSIONS, INC. served on 4/29/2014, answer due 5/23/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2014 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. WMM HOLDINGS, LLC served on 4/15/2014, answer due 5/23/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 8, 2014 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. WMM, LLC served on 4/15/2014, answer due 5/23/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC re #22 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #19 MOTION to Dismiss by WMM, LLC and WMM HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 7, 2014 Filing 20 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #19 MOTION to Dismiss by WMM, LLC and WMM HOLDINGS, LLC (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 17, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 7/21/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 16, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. Responses due by 7/7/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants WMM, LLC and WMM Holdings, LLC's Motion for Dismissal Under 12(B)(6), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 6, 2014 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Frank M. Gasparo and Ralph A. Dengler, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 6, 2014 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Frank M. Gasparo, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 6, 2014 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ralph A. Dengler, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 3, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Frank M. Gasparo and Ralph A. Dengler: $ 300.00, receipt number NEW020290 (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #11 MOTION to Dismiss (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 2, 2014 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DATA CONVERSIONS, INC., DOES 1-20, WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Frank M. Gasparo and Ralph A. Dengler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/29/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (GESUALDO, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 27, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH J. MILLER on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 27, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/16/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of WMM, LLC and WMM Holdings, LLC's Motion for Partial Dismissal Under 12(b)(6), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 10 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Frank M. Gasparo, Esq. and Ralph A. Dengler, Esq. for by WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank M. Gasparo In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Declaration of Ralph A. Dengler In Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD MATTHEW NOSHER on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (NOSHER, TODD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LEDA DUNN WETTRE on behalf of WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 16, 2014 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, submitted by WMM, LLC, DATA CONVERSIONS, INC., WMM HOLDINGS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/23/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; the time of Defendants WMM Holdings, LLC, WMM, LLC, and Data Conversions, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to May 23, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/16/14. (jd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 15, 2014 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 14, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. LISTON on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 11, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DATA CONVERSIONS, INC., WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 11, 2014 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 11, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
April 11, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DATA CONVERSIONS, INC., DOES 1-20, WMM HOLDINGS, LLC, WMM, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5623208) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement Notice of Related Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. v. Data Conversions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alex G. Patchen
Represented By: RONALD ABRAMSON
Represented By: DAVID G. LISTON
Represented By: MORD MICHAEL LEWIS
Represented By: ARI JASON JAFFESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAG Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Alex G. Patchen
Represented By: RONALD ABRAMSON
Represented By: DAVID G. LISTON
Represented By: MORD MICHAEL LEWIS
Represented By: ARI JASON JAFFESS
Represented By: Alex Gregg Patchen
Represented By: Allen J Wilt
Represented By: Elizabeth Joy Bassett
Represented By: David Guerrero Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMM Holdings LLC
Represented By: ANDREW P. MACARTHUR
Represented By: JILLIAN ALEXANDRIA CENTANNI
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO
Represented By: GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA
Represented By: Ralph A. Dengler
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Represented By: JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Represented By: LEDA DUNN WETTRE
Represented By: Frank M. Gasparo
Represented By: TODD MATTHEW NOSHER
Represented By: Liane K Wakayama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DATA CONVERSIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMM, LLC
Represented By: ANDREW P. MACARTHUR
Represented By: JILLIAN ALEXANDRIA CENTANNI
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES GESUALDO
Represented By: GIANNA ELISSA CRICCO-LIZZA
Represented By: Ralph A. Dengler
Represented By: KEITH J. MILLER
Represented By: JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Represented By: LEDA DUNN WETTRE
Represented By: Frank M. Gasparo
Represented By: TODD MATTHEW NOSHER
Represented By: Liane K Wakayama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?