Foremost Signature Insurance Company v. Gmuender Engineering, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Foremost Signature Insurance Company
Defendant: John Doe Gmuender, Jane Doe Gmuender, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Mary E. Gmuender, Granby Realty Holdings, LLC, Josef C. Gmuender, Granite State Insurance Company, Gmuender Engineering, LLC and William Huber
Case Number: 3:2019cv00508
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company re #3 Summons Issued,. Josef C. Gmuender waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Sluga, Gena)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company re #3 Summons Issued,. Gmuender Engineering, LLC waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Sluga, Gena)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company re #3 Summons Issued,. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Sluga, Gena)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company re #3 Summons Issued,. Granite State Insurance Company waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Sluga, Gena)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company re #3 Summons Issued,. Granby Realty Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Sluga, Gena)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Foremost Signature Insurance Company re #3 Summons Issued,. William Huber waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Sluga, Gena)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Foremost Signature Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan, Other Affiliate Farmers Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Fire Insurance Exchange, Other Affiliate Truck Insurance Exchange for Foremost Signature Insurance Company added. (Sluga, Gena)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Josef C. Gmuender, Mary E. Gmuender, Gmuender Engineering, LLC, Granby Realty Holdings, LLC, Granite State Insurance Company, William Huber, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Granby Realty Holdings, LLC, #2 Granite State Insurance Company, #3 Josef C. Gmuender, #4 Mary E. Gmuender, #5 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, #6 William Huber) (LH)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
August 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5669178) by Foremost Signature Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Sluga, Gena) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foremost Signature Insurance Company v. Gmuender Engineering, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Gmuender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Gmuender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary E. Gmuender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granby Realty Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josef C. Gmuender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gmuender Engineering, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Signature Insurance Company
Represented By: Gena L. Sluga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?