Kravetz v. State of Nevada
Petitioner: Richard J. Kravetz
Respondent: State of Nevada and Nevada, State of
Case Number: 3:2019cv00510
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re ECF No. #7 Filing Fee payment, filed by Richard J. Kravetz. (LH)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number NVRNO-004725. (DRM)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Richard J. Kravetz. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(LH)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice; denying a certificate of appealability; denying as moot ECF No. #3 petitioners request for oral argument; directing the Clerk to send petitioner two copies each of an application form to proceed in forma pauperis for incarcerated persons and a noncapital Section 2254 habeas petition form, one copy of the instructions for each form, and a copy of the papers that he submitted in this action ; directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION - Request Oral Argument by Petitioner Richard J. Kravetz. Responses due by 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (LH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against State of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00510-RCJ-WGC. (KR)
August 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE - No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee was received with Initiating Documents, by Petitioner Richard J. Kravetz. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Notice) (KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kravetz v. State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard J. Kravetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?