Aberha v. Director Nevada Dept of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Ashenafi G Aberha
Defendant: Director Nevada Dept of Corrections, Gittere, James Dzurenda, W. Gitterre, M. Delafante, G. T. Davis and Sunday
Case Number: 3:2019cv00606
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Ashenafi G Aberha. (DRM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT by Ashenafi G Aberha. Proof of service due by 2/2/2020.(DRM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ashenafi G Aberha. (DRM)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Clerk will send P approved IFP form and instructions. (Mailed to P 10/4/2019.) Fully complete IFP form or $400 filing fee due by 11/3/2019. P will submit a complaint by 11/3/2019. Clerk will send P 1983 form and instructions. (Mailed to P 10/4/2019.) Clerk will also send P a copy of his ECF No. #1 -1 Notice. (Copy sent to P 10/4/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Intent to file 42 U.S.C 1983 Civil Rights Complaint) (DRM) Modified on 10/4/2019 at request of PR renamed 1-1 from complaint to notice.... (LE).
October 2, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aberha v. Director Nevada Dept of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Nevada Dept of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Gitterre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Delafante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashenafi G Aberha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?