Gallegos v. Wickham et al
Plaintiff: Jose Gallegos
Defendant: William Gittere and Harold Wickham
Case Number: 3:2019cv00613
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
2 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. #4 IFP application; directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff the approved IFP form and instructions (Attached hereto for distribution to P); giving Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this order to file a fully complete IFP application or pay the $400 filing fee; if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result; the Clerk will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1), but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Inmate IFP Form with instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE and statement of inmate account, by Plaintiff Jose Gallegos (DRM)
November 14, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Clerk send Plaintiff the approved IFP form and instructions (Attached hereto for distribution); Fully complete IFP application or $400 filing fee due by 11/9/2019; if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result; the Clerk will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1), but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP for prisoners and instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE : No IFP Application, or Filing Fee was received with Initiating Documents, filed by Jose Gallegos. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LH)
October 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. Wickham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gallegos
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?