Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Lori Crown et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Defendant: William Kendall, Lori Crown, Collin Crown and Austin Crown
Cross Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive (as to Crossclaim Doc No. 16 filed
Case Number: 3:2019cv00626
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
2 Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
October 29, 2019 Filing 39 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to Cross Complaints and Stipulation to Grant Leave to Amend Cross Complaint re #16 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #22 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Defendant Lori Crown. (Kintz, Susanna)
October 28, 2019 Filing 40 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. 35 QC Notice, addressed to Susanna Truax Kintz. "No mail receptable. Unable to forward." (KR)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting ECF No. #36 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Keiko J. Kojima for Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 21, 2019 Filing 37 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF No. 33 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP, addressed to Susanna Truax Kintz. (LH)
October 21, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Keiko J. Kojima for Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (DRM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Susanna Truax Kintz is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LE)
October 16, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Docket Correction to 32 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, and 33 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, : ENTERED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. (no image attached) (LE)
October 11, 2019 Filing 33 ENTERED IN ERROR NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Susanna Truax Kintz to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/25/2019. (no image attached) (LE) Modified on 10/16/2019 (LE).
October 11, 2019 Filing 32 ENTERED IN ERROR - Hartford terminated on 10/9/19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Keiko J. Kojima to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/25/2019. (no image attached) (LE) Modified on 10/16/2019 (LE).
October 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)
October 11, 2019 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-05094. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. (LH)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY; TRANSFER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEVADA by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company shall be dismissed from this action with prejudice. Defendants' request to transfer this case is GRANTED. This action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. The remainder of all the funds on deposit with Court plus any accrued interest shall be made payable and transferred to the Clerk for the United States District Court for the District of Nevada for deposit with that Court. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Proposed) Order re Dismissal of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada re Order,,,,,, Distribution of Funds,,,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,,, #21 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Motion filed 9/24/2019 #26 . The document is stricken. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING AN ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. All proposed signature items shall be e-mailed to the chambers' e-mail address at AB_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov in Word format. ONLY proposed order signature items should be emailed to the chambers' e-mail address. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 26 * STRICKEN * NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING AN ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM filed by Cross-Defendant Lori Crown. (Attorney Susanna Truax Kintz added to party Lori Crown(pty:crd)) (Kintz, Susanna) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS FILED 9/256/2019 #28 ** Modified on 9/26/2019 (gk). [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Counter Claimant Lori Crown, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #22 served on September 18, 2019. (Kintz, Susanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Lori Crownto Order,,,,, Order to Show Cause,,,, #23 (Kintz, Susanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT LORI CROWN TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN AS MOOT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: On 9/11/2019, the Court issued an order discharging Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ("Hartford") from any liability to Lori Drown, Austin Crown, Collin Crown, and William Kendall (collectively, "Defendants") with respect to Group Insurance Policy GL-099501 ("the Policy") and/or coverage for life insurance benefits under the Policy or Eldorado Resort's employee welfare benefit plan (the "Plan") #21 . The Court further ordered, inter alia, that Defendants are restrained from proceeding with or commencing any action against Hartford for any matter arising out of relating to the Policy and/or the Plan. On 9/16/2019, Defendant Lori Crown filed an answer to Hartford's complaint, and asserted cross-claims #22 . The Court, on its own motion, ORDERS that Defendant Lori Crown show cause why the answer and cross-claims should not be stricken as moot in light of the Court's 9/11/2019 order. Defendant Lori Crown shall file its response showing cause within 14 days of the issuance of this order. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , CROSSCLAIM against Austin Crown, Collin Crown, William Kendall filed by Defendant Lori Crown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kintz, Susanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISCHARGE AND DISMISSAL OF HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #19 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ("Hartford") is hereby and shall be discharged from any liability to Defendants to the full extent permitted by law with respect to Group Insurance Policy GL-099501 issued by Hartford to the Trustees of Hartford Group Insurance Trust, and/or coverage for life insurance benefits under the Policy or Eldorado Resort's employee welfare benefit plan ("the Plan"). Hartford shall be awarded the sum of $6,000 as reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with this interpleader action, to be paid out of the proceeds deposited with the Clerk of this Court. After notifying the Court that Hartford has received the sum of $6,000, the parties shall file a proposed order (1) dismissing Hartford from this action with prejudice, (2) transferring this action to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada, and (3) transferring the remainder of the funds on deposit with this Court plus any accrued interest to the Clerk for the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. All case management dates are removed from in this action. See document for further details. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Counterclaimant Austin Crown, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #16 served on 09/03/2019. (Pope, Carole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Discharge of and Dismissal of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company; Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lori Crown answer now due 9/16/2019, filed by Defendant Lori Crown.(Attorney Susanna Truax Kintz added to party Lori Crown(pty:dft))(Kintz, Susanna) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (vv) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , First CROSSCLAIM against Lori Crown filed by Attorney for Defendants Collin Crown, Austin Crown, William Kendall.(Attorney Carole M Pope added to party Austin Crown(pty:dft), Attorney Carole M Pope added to party Collin Crown(pty:dft), Attorney Carole M Pope added to party William Kendall(pty:dft))(Pope, Carole) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. upon Collin Crown waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Defendant Collin Crown. (Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. upon Austin Crown waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Defendant Austin Crown. (Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. upon William Kendall waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Attorney Carole M. Pope for Defendant William Kendall. (Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. upon Lori Crown waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Attorney Susanna Kintz for Defendant Lori Crown. (Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company of Check No. 23783179 in the amount of $200,235.07. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Deposit)(Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 7 . Document number 7 due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to attach the entire image of the new action. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Austin Crown, Collin Crown, Lori Crown, William Kendall. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Austin Crown, Collin Crown, Lori Crown, William Kendall. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, identifying : Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company; Defendant Lori Crown, an individual; Defendant Austin Crown, an individual; Defendant Collin Crown, an individual; and Defendant William Kendall, an individual. (Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23904991 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Kojima, Keiko) [Transferred from California Central on 10/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Lori Crown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kendall
Represented By: Carole M Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Crown
Represented By: Susanna Truax Kintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collin Crown
Represented By: Carole M Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Crown
Represented By: Carole M Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Keiko J Kojima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive (as to Crossclaim Doc No. 16 filed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?