Bruneau v. Countrywide Moving Plus, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Bruneau
Defendant: Supreme Van Lines and Countrywide Moving Plus, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00634
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 ***Notes: The U.S. Magistrate Judge on this case has changed her name to Judge Carla Baldwin effective immediately. (LH)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Countrywide Moving Plus LLC, Supreme Van Lines, re ECF No. #1 Complaint, ECF Nos. #8 , #9 Proposed Summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KR)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Countrywide Moving Plus, LLC by Plaintiff Christopher Bruneau. (Winograd, Ellen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Supreme Van Lines, Inc by Plaintiff Christopher Bruneau. (Winograd, Ellen)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #5 Summons Returned Unexecuted, #6 Summons Returned Unexecuted : Documents #5 and #6 were filed in error, please disregard. (no image attached) (LE)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christopher Bruneau as to Countrywide Moving Plus, LLC. (Winograd, Ellen) Modified on 10/24/2019 PER Haleigh at Woodburn Wedge filed in error (LE).
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Christopher Bruneau as to Supreme Van Lines. (Winograd, Ellen) Modified on 10/24/2019 per Haleigh at Woodburn Wedge filed in error(LE).
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Christopher Bruneau. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Winograd, Ellen)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (LE)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Christopher Bruneau. (Winograd, Ellen)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5742286) by Christopher Bruneau. Proof of service due by 1/15/2020.(Winograd, Ellen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruneau v. Countrywide Moving Plus, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Van Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Moving Plus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bruneau
Represented By: Ellen Jean Winograd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?