Coots v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Sean E. Coots
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv00689
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. #5 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to File an Amended Petition re ECF No. #3 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Sean E. Coots. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(AB)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number NVRNO-004809. (no image attached) (DRM)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that petitioner's IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) and Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -2) are DENIED; Clerk directed to send petitioner 2 copies of this order, and the 2254 habeas form with instructions (Mailed to P on 11/21/19); petitioner must pay the $5.00 and file an amended petition within 30 days of the date of this order; failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this action without further advance notice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Isidro Baca, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:19-cv-00689-LRH-CLB. (LH)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Sean E. Coots. (Attachments: #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion for Counsel, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LH)
November 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coots v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sean E. Coots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?