Magallon v. Mineral County et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Magallon
Defendant: Ailene Sanchez, Hugh Qualls, Juanchichos Ventura, Mineral County and Mineral, County of
Case Number: 3:2019cv00704
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/13/2020, granting in part Plaintiff's ECF No. #12 Motion to Postpone ENE Conference. ENE will be set for a date between 3/18/2020 and 5/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Hearing by Plaintiff Melissa Magallon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Ching, Kenneth)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Hugh Qualls, Ailene Sanchez, Juanchichos Ventura. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mercado, Alice)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Hugh Qualls, Ailene Sanchez, Juanchichos Ventura. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/13/2020.(Mercado, Alice) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alice C Mercado on behalf of Defendants Hugh Qualls, Ailene Sanchez, Juanchichos Ventura. (Mercado, Alice)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Magallon re #2 Summons Issued. Juanchichos Ventura served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Ching, Kenneth)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Magallon re #2 Summons Issued. Hugh Qualls served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Ching, Kenneth)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Magallon re #2 Summons Issued. Ailene Sanchez served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Ching, Kenneth)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Magallon re #2 Summons Issued. Mineral, County of served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Ching, Kenneth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Melissa Magallon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ching, Kenneth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Aileen Sanchez, #2 Hugh Qualls, #3 Juanchichos Ventura) (DRM) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/25/2019) (DRM).
November 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (LE)
November 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5788819) by Melissa Magallon. Proof of service due by 2/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Ching, Kenneth) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magallon v. Mineral County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Magallon
Represented By: Kenneth K Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ailene Sanchez
Represented By: Sarah Marie Molleck
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Qualls
Represented By: Sarah Marie Molleck
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanchichos Ventura
Represented By: Sarah Marie Molleck
Represented By: Alice C Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?