Kealey v. Russell
Plaintiff: Sean Kealey
Defendant: Chris Russell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00741
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re Hearing: The case management conference currently set for 2/12/2020 at 01:00 PM will be conducted in Reno Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. All other aspects of this Court's order setting case management conference #11 remain in full effect. (no image attached) (LGM)
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT (Special Scheduling Review Requested) by Plaintiff Sean Kealey (Ching, Kenneth)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting ECF No. #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney : Attorney Calvin Roy Winder withdrawn from the case for Defendant Chris Russell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/21/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CALVIN WINDER for Defendant Chris Russell. (Bubala, Louis)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Chris Russell. (Bubala, Louis)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Chris Russell. (Bubala, Louis)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/3/2020. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A case management conference is set for 2/12/2020 at 01:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically for this hearing and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 19741. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Wednesday, January 29, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Sean Kealey. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Ching, Kenneth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Chris Russell. Responses due by 1/2/2020. (Bubala, Louis)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chris Russell. (Bubala, Louis)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chris Russell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bubala, Louis)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER approving ECF No. #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Greggory J. Savage on behalf of Defendant Chris Russell and approving Designation of Local Counsel Louis M. Bubala III. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/13/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Greggory J. Savage and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Louis M. Bubala III (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5811062) by Defendant Chris Russell. (Bubala, Louis)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Greggory J. Savage to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/26/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Kenneth K. Ching is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 12/30/2019 COMPLIED (WJ).
December 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV19-02220, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5809255) by Chris Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bubala, Louis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kealey v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Kealey
Represented By: Kenneth K Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Russell
Represented By: Louis Martin Bubala, III
Represented By: Calvin Roy Winder
Represented By: Greggory J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?