Delta Saloon v. AmeriGas Propane, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Delta Saloon, Inc.
Defendant: AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc. and AmeriGas Propane, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00748
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/11/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Karen Walker. A Telephonic Discovery Hearing is set for Tuesday, March 17, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb.Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-888-557-8511, enter the access code 3599743, and enter the security code 31720, approximately five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. The court will address the Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF No. #13 ). IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Delta Saloon, Inc.. (Shanks, Therese)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. The parties' Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is due February 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/31/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE STIPULATED DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER by Defendant AmeriGas Propane, Inc.. (Ferguson, Sarah)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew R. Rosek for AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., and AmeriGas Propane, Inc.; and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew C. Addison. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/30/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney H. Brook Laskey for AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., and AmeriGas Propane, Inc.; and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew C. Addison. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/30/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew R. Rosek and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew C. Addison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5860635) by Defendants AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, Inc.. (Addison, Matthew)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by H. Brook Laskey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew C. Addison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5860616) by Defendants AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, Inc.. (Addison, Matthew)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, Inc.. (Ferguson, Sarah)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, Inc.. (Ferguson, Sarah)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/6/2020.(Ferguson, Sarah) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/19/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/3/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ferguson, Sarah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV19-02219, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5816342) by AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Sarah) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Saloon v. AmeriGas Propane, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriGas Propane Parts & Service, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Ashley Ferguson
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Represented By: Matthew R Rosek
Represented By: Henry (H) Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriGas Propane, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Ashley Ferguson
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Represented By: Matthew R Rosek
Represented By: Henry (H) Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Saloon, Inc.
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Represented By: Therese Shanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?