Kozlowski v. Saul
Plaintiff: Paul Scot Kozlowski
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00086
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carolyn Beth Chen on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Chen, Carolyn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re ECF No. #6 Complaint, ECF No. #7 Summons Issued as to USA. Andrew Saul served on 3/23/2020. (KR)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving ECF No. #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Lindsay Osterhout and approving Designation of Local Counsel by Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 United States Attorney) (LW)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Paul Scot Kozlowski. (Filed and distributed per ECF No. #5 Minute Order). (LW)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/13/2020. Plaintiff's IFP Application (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED; Clerk shall file the complaint; Clerk shall issue summons to the following: Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney General, United States Attorney; Clerk shall deliver the summons and sufficient copies of the complaint to the USM for service (Delivered to the USM on 3/13/2020); Clerk shall send Plaintiff sufficient copies of service of process forms (USM-285) for each defendant (Attached hereto for distribution to P via counsel); Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days in which to return the required forms USM-285 to the U.S. Marshal. (Attachments: #1 First USM-285, #2 Second USM-285, #3 Third USM-285)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AB)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay Fulton Osterhout and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5879841) by Plaintiff Paul Scot Kozlowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paul Scot Kozlowski. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Paul Scot Kozlowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons U. S. Attorney, #4 Summons Atty. Gen'l, #5 Summons OGC) (Taylor, Hal) Modified on 2/10/2020 (AB).
February 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozlowski v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Carolyn Beth Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Scot Kozlowski
Represented By: Lindsay F. Osterhout
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?