Hunter v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nancy Marie Hunter
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00105
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Nancy Marie Hunter re #1 Complaint,,. (Binder, Charles)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving ECF No. #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Binder and approving Designation of Local Counsel by Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/10/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (LW)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Charles E. Binder and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5904728) by Plaintiff Nancy Marie Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nancy Marie Hunter. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued AUSA by Plaintiff Nancy Marie Hunter. (Taylor, Hal)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew M. Sauland U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 SSA) (LW) Modified on 2/27/2020 to remove U.S. Attorney(LW).
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (LW)
February 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5891020) by Nancy Marie Hunter. Proof of service due by 5/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Summons AG, #3 Summons SSA) (Taylor, Hal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 2/18/2020 (LW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Marie Hunter
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: Charles E. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?