Taylor v. Saul
Plaintiff: Janina Maria Taylor
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00157
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/21/2020. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the Commissioner's motion to stay proceedings (ECF No. #9 ) no later than noon, Monday, April 27, 2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Cheung, Allison)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed : Christy Dyer for U.S. Attorney's Office obo Andrew Saul served on 3/27/2020. (DRM)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada. (LW)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Janina Maria Taylor. Filed and distributed per ECF No. #4 Order. (LW)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP Application (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED; the complaint shall PROCEED; the Clerk is instructed to FILE the complaint; the Clerk shall SERVE Commissioner SSA by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail to the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel and to the U.S. Attorney General (Cert Mail # 7013 1710 0001 6894 2167 and 7013 1710 0001 6894 2181); the Clerk shall ISSUE a summons to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and complaint to USM for service on U.S. Attorney's Office, Reno (Summons, complaint and copy of this order delivered to USM on 3/26/2020); plaintiff shall serve defendant a copy every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LW)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (LW)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Janina Maria Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Manaul Filing) (LW)
March 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janina Maria Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?