Anderson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Anderson
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00192
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #10 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
May 15, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss #13 Amended Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 5/29/2020. (Cheong, Holly)
May 15, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Replies due by 5/22/2020. (Cheong, Holly)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting ECF No. #20 Stipulation : Wells Fargo shall have up to and including May 15, 2020, to file its responses to the Motion to Remand and Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. #10 , #13 .) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 1, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #10 Motion to Remand to State Court, #13 Amended Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Cheong, Holly)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A telephonic case management conference is set for 7/1/2020 at 09:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Counsel shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 20192. The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than the close of business on Wednesday, June 24, 2020. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 ERRATA to #14 Response by Plaintiff Matthew Anderson. (Pankopf, Tory) Modified on 4/23/2020 ad link to motion #6 (WJ).
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Matthew Anderson. Replies due by 4/30/2020. (Pankopf, Tory)
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #14 Response. Attorney Tory Pankopf advised to review the PDF file that is attached to entry #14 . Please file the proper PDF file appropriate for document #14 . (no image attached) (WJ)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Matthew Anderson. Replies due by 4/29/2020. (Pankopf, Tory)
April 22, 2020 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Matthew Anderson. Removes parties. (Pankopf, Tory)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/20/2020. Good cause appearing, Plaintiff's motion to extend time (ECF No. #11 ) to file a response to Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. #6 ) is granted. Responses due by 4/24/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Matthew Anderson. (Pankopf, Tory)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,,,, by Plaintiff Matthew Anderson. Responses due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Correspondence From WF to Anderson, #2 Exhibit 2 Emails to/from Counsel re Cease and Desist, #3 Exhibit 3 State Court TRO, #4 Exhibit 4 Realtor.com Screenshot of Web Page re Property Values, #5 Declaration of Tory M Pankopf in Support of Motion to Remand) (Pankopf, Tory)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Order to Dismiss Quality Loan Service Corporation) (Cheong, Holly)
April 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Order to Dismiss Quality Loan Service Corporation) (Cheong, Holly)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #6 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Grant, Bargain and Sale Deed recorded on May 19, 2000, #2 Exhibit B-Deed of Trust recorded on July 5, 2005, #3 Exhibit C-Deed of Trust recorded on June 11, 2013, #4 Exhibit D-Deed of Full Reconveyance recorded on July 1, 2013, #5 Exhibit E-Corporate Assignment of Deed of Trust recorded on September 6, 2013, #6 Exhibit F-Complaint, Case No. 13-cv-0270, #7 Exhibit G-Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Judgment, #8 Exhibit H-Notice of Appeal, #9 Exhibit I-Notice of Breach and Default and of Election to Cause Sale of Real Property under Deed of Trust recorded on October 8, 2019, #10 Exhibit J-State of Nevada Foreclosure Mediation Program Certificate recorded on January 23, 2020, #11 Exhibit K-Notice of Trustees Sale recorded on January 31, 2020, #12 Exhibit L-Grant, Bargain, Sale Deed recorded on February 28, 2020, #13 Exhibit M-Substitution of Trustee and Full Reconveyance recorded on March 5, 2020, #14 Exhibit N-Notice of Rescission of Notice of Breach and Default and of Election to Cause Sale of Real Property under Deed of Trust recorded on March 9, 2020) (Cheong, Holly)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 4/17/2020. (Cheong, Holly)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, a division of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. dba Americas Servicing Company, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. dba Wells Fargo Home Equity, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank National Association, aka Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. added. (Cheong, Holly)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Shane P. Gale is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 4/14/2020 COMPLIED (WJ).
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/30/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/14/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 27, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Court, Douglas County, NV, Case Number 2020-cv-00052, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5944660) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit C-Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application for TRO and OSC, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Pendency of Action, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Unavailability of Counsel, #6 Exhibit F-Order Granting Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, #7 Exhibit G-Notice of Withdrawal of Pendency of Action, #8 Exhibit H-Declaration of Non-Monetary Status Pursuant to NRS 107.029, #9 Exhibit I-Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Quality Loan, #10 Exhibit J-Grant, Bargain, Sale Deed, #11 Exhibit K-Correspondence re Service on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cheong, Holly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Represented By: Shane P. Gale
Represented By: Shane Patrick Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Holly Cheong
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Anderson
Represented By: Tory M. Pankopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?