Garry v. Torress et al
Plaintiff: Remoh Garry
Defendant: Tommy Stephens, Lt. Stroud, Duane Wilson, Brian Williams, Torress, Culinary Supervisors and Medical Director (NDOC)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00197
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Remoh Garry. NOTE: ECF No. #10 is a fully complete IFP (LW) Modified on 4/16/2020 to note ECF No. #10 as complete IFP by Plaintiff (PR).
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION in Support of Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis re ECF No. #6 Motion/Application, by Plaintiff Remoh Garry. (AB)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address to LCC, by Plaintiff Remoh Garry. (Address already correct on docket; no changes made.) (KR)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Remoh Garry. (AB)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Remoh Garry. (Attachments: #1 State Documents: IFP Application and Order) (AB)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Remoh Garry. (AB)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Clerk will send P approved IFP form and instructions. (Attached hereto for distribution to P via LCC law library.) P shall by 6/1/2020, either pay $400 filing fee, or file fully Complete IFP application as specified herein. Clerk of the Court will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Remoh Garry. (LW)
April 1, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Envelope) (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garry v. Torress et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culinary Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director (NDOC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remoh Garry
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?