Brock vs Renee Baker
Plaintiff: Demetrius Lamar Brock
Defendant: State of Nevada
Respondent: Renee Baker
Case Number: 3:2020cv00220
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jaimie Stilz on behalf of Respondent Renee Baker. (Stilz, Jaimie)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add AG as counsel for the respondents. Clerk shall e-serve respondents a copy of the Petition (ECF No. #1 ), and a copy of this order. (E-service 4/17/2020; Petition via NEF regeneration on 4/17/2020.) Respondents will have 30 days from the date of this order (5/16/2020) to appear in this action. Respondents will have 90 days from the date of this order (7/15/2020) to answer or respond to the Petition. Reply due 45 days thereafter. (See pdf order for additional contingent deadlines.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Plaintiff Demetrius Lamar Brock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Oram, Christopher)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0978-5959898) by Demetrius Lamar Brock. (Oram, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brock vs Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Lamar Brock
Represented By: Christopher R Oram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Jaimie Stilz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?