City of Fernley v. United States Bureau of Reclamation
Plaintiff: City of Fernley and Fernley, City of
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00221
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Fernley's Petition (ECF No. #1 ) is denied. Fernley's Emergency Motion (ECF No. #4 ) is denied as moot. Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to #10 Response by Plaintiff Fernley, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter) (Taggart, Paul)
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Ogden.The Court has reviewed Respondent's response (ECF No. #10 ) and finds that a hearing is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court vacates the telephone hearing set for April 16, 2020 (ECF No. 8). Petitioner's reply in support of its petition for writ of mandamus must be filed by 9:00 a.m. PST on April 17, 2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
April 15, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, by Defendant United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Terri Edwards) (McDonald, Evelyn)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fernley, City of. United States Bureau of Reclamation served on 4/10/2020. (Taggart, Paul)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/13/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the telephonic hearing on Plaintiff's motion (ECF Nos. #1 and #4 ) is delayed to 1:30 PM on 4/16/2020 in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. The parties are to call 1-888-251-2909, at least 5 minutes before the start time, and enter code 3803398 and password 041620. The use of cell phones and/or speaker phones is prohibited. Members of the public may call into this hearing using the telephonic information above but must provide the deputy clerk with their names and media affiliations (if any.) Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Persons listening to the hearing remotely must mute the sound on their devices and must not interrupt the proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Evelyn Woods McDonald on behalf of Defendant United States Bureau of Reclamation. (McDonald, Evelyn)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/10/2020. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Any response to Plaintiff's emergency petition for writ of mandamus (ECF No. #1 ) is due by 4/15/2020. Plaintiff's counsel are directed to serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants forthwith. A telephonic hearing is set for 4/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Chief Judge Miranda M. Du. Counsel are to call 1-888-251-2909, at least 5 minutes prior to the hearing, and enter code 3803398 and password 04162020. The use of speaker phones and/or cell phones is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiff Fernley, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Taggart, Paul) Modified on 4/13/2020 add emergency (WJ).
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Bureau of Reclamation. (LW)
April 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff City of Fernley. (Taggart, Paul)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5960891) by City of Fernley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Letter, #4 Exhibit Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Affidavit, #6 Exhibit Scientific Report, #7 Exhibit Press Release, #8 Exhibit Article, #9 Exhibit Press Release, #10 Exhibit Article) (Taggart, Paul) Modified on 4/10/2020 add word Emergency (WJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Fernley v. United States Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fernley
Represented By: David H Rigdon
Represented By: Paul G Taggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernley, City of
Represented By: Paul G Taggart
Represented By: David H Rigdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Nicholas Trutanich
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: Evelyn Woods McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?