Watson v. Bennett Truck Transport LLC et al
Plaintiff: Paris L Watson
Defendant: Brian Sterling and Bennett Truck Transport LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00298
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brian Sterling, Bennett Motor Express, LLC by Paris L Watson. Adds and removes parties. (Balzli, Stephanie)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paris L Watson that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Blox, LLC for Paris L Watson added. (Leverty, Patrick)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving ECF No. #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Joseph Balzli and approving Designation of Local Counsel of Patrick Leverty. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie Emens Balzli and approving Designation of Local Counsel of Patrick Leverty. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Joseph Balzli and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Patrick Leverty (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6024340) by Plaintiff Paris L Watson. (Leverty, Patrick)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie Emens Balzli and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Patrick Leverty (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6024331) by Plaintiff Paris L Watson. (Leverty, Patrick)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Service re #5 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Paris L Watson. (Leverty, Patrick)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brian Sterling) (LW)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher Joseph Balzli to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/4/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Stephanie Balzli to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/4/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Paris L Watson. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bennett Truck Transport, #3 Summons Brian Sterling) (Leverty, Patrick) Modified on 5/21/2020 reflect a complaint. (WJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Bennett Truck Transport LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris L Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett Truck Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?