Witter v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: William Witter
Respondent: Attorney General Aaron D. Ford and Warden William Gittere
Case Number: 3:2020cv00345
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Motion to Extend Time. The response to the Order to Show Cause is due August 24, 2020. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to file response to re #9 Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel,,,,,, Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,,,,,,,,, by Petitioner William Witter. (Newman, Stacy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Witter re #9 Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel,,,,,, Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis,,,,,,,,,,,. (Newman, Stacy)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents Aaron D. Ford, William Gittere. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Conner, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Witter's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED in part. Witter is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis in all respects other than payment of the filing fee, which has already been paid. Witter's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED. FPD is appointed to represent Witter. FPD will have until July 24, 2020 to file either a notice of appearance as counsel or a notice indicating its inability to represent Witter. With the notice of appearance, FPD must also show cause why this action should not be dismissed as an unauthorized second or successive petition under 28 USC 2244(b). If FPD is unable to represent Witter, alternate counsel will be directed to respond to this order once appointed. Clerk is directed to electronically serve a copy of this order on FPD (Electronic Service on 6/22/2020). Clerk is directed to add Aaron D. Ford AG as counsel for Respondents and to electronically serve upon Respondents a copy of Witter's Petition (ECF No. #2 ) and this order (Electronic Service on 6/22/2020; Petition via NEF Regeneration). Respondents have until July 24, 2020 to enter a notice of appearance, but no further action in this case is required until ordered otherwise. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Cases Under LR 42-1 by William Witter. (Newman, Stacy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner William Witter. (Newman, Stacy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT 7.1 - 47 to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Death Penalty by Petitioner William Witter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7.2, #2 Exhibit 7.3, #3 Exhibit 7.4, #4 Exhibit 7.5, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17, #15 Exhibit 18, #16 Exhibit 19, #17 Exhibit 20, #18 Exhibit 21, #19 Exhibit 22, #20 Exhibit 23, #21 Exhibit 24, #22 Exhibit 25, #23 Exhibit 26, #24 Exhibit 27, #25 Exhibit 28, #26 Exhibit 29, #27 Exhibit 30, #28 Exhibit 31, #29 Exhibit 32, #30 Exhibit 33, #31 Exhibit 34, #32 Exhibit 35, #33 Exhibit 36, #34 Exhibit 37, #35 Exhibit 38, #36 Exhibit 39, #37 Exhibit 40, #38 Exhibit 41, #39 Exhibit 42, #40 Exhibit 43, #41 Exhibit 44, #42 Exhibit 45, #43 Exhibit 46, #44 Exhibit 47) (Newman, Stacy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT 4.1 - 6.19 to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Death Penalty by Petitioner William Witter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4.2, #2 Exhibit 4.3, #3 Exhibit 4.4, #4 Exhibit 4.5, #5 Exhibit 4.6, #6 Exhibit 5.1, #7 Exhibit 5.2, #8 Exhibit 5.3, #9 Exhibit 5.4, #10 Exhibit 5.5, #11 Exhibit 5.6, #12 Exhibit 5.7, #13 Exhibit 5.8, #14 Exhibit 5.9, #15 Exhibit 5.10, #16 Exhibit 5.11, #17 Exhibit 5.12, #18 Exhibit 5.13, #19 Exhibit 5.14, #20 Exhibit 5.15, #21 Exhibit 5.16, #22 Exhibit 5.17, #23 Exhibit 5.18, #24 Exhibit 6.1, #25 Exhibit 6.2, #26 Exhibit 6.3, #27 Exhibit 6.4, #28 Exhibit 6.5, #29 Exhibit 6.6, #30 Exhibit 6.7, #31 Exhibit 6.8, #32 Exhibit 6.9, #33 Exhibit 6.10, #34 Exhibit 6.11, #35 Exhibit 6.12, #36 Exhibit 6.13, #37 Exhibit 6.14, #38 Exhibit 6.15, #39 Exhibit 6.16, #40 Exhibit 6.17, #41 Exhibit 6.18, #42 Exhibit 6.19) (Newman, Stacy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBIT 3.1 - 3.34 to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Death Penalty by Petitioner William Witter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3.2, #2 Exhibit 3.3, #3 Exhibit 3.4, #4 Exhibit 3.5, #5 Exhibit 3.6, #6 Exhibit 3.7, #7 Exhibit 3.8, #8 Exhibit 3.9, #9 Exhibit 3.10, #10 Exhibit 3.11, #11 Exhibit 3.12, #12 Exhibit 3.13, #13 Exhibit 3.14, #14 Exhibit 3.15, #15 Exhibit 3.16, #16 Exhibit 3.17, #17 Exhibit 3.18, #18 Exhibit 3.19, #19 Exhibit 3.20, #20 Exhibit 3.21, #21 Exhibit 3.22, #22 Exhibit 3.23, #23 Exhibit 3.24, #24 Exhibit 3.25, #25 Exhibit 3.26, #26 Exhibit 3.27, #27 Exhibit 3.28, #28 Exhibit 3.29, #29 Exhibit 3.30, #30 Exhibit 3.31, #31 Exhibit 3.32, #32 Exhibit 3.33, #33 Exhibit 3.34) (Newman, Stacy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT 1.1 - 2.32 to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Death Penalty by Petitioner William Witter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.1, #2 Exhibit 1.2, #3 Exhibit 1.3, #4 Exhibit 1.4, #5 Exhibit 1.5, #6 Exhibit 1.6, #7 Exhibit 2.1, #8 Exhibit 2.2, #9 Exhibit 2.3, #10 Exhibit 2.4, #11 Exhibit 2.5, #12 Exhibit 2.6, #13 Exhibit 2.7, #14 Exhibit 2.8, #15 Errata 2.9, #16 Exhibit 2.10, #17 Exhibit 2.11, #18 Exhibit 2.12, #19 Exhibit 2.13, #20 Exhibit 2.14, #21 Exhibit 2.15, #22 Exhibit 2.16, #23 Exhibit 2.17, #24 Exhibit 2.18, #25 Exhibit 2.19, #26 Exhibit 2.20, #27 Exhibit 2.21, #28 Exhibit 2.22, #29 Exhibit 2.23, #30 Exhibit 2.24, #31 Exhibit 2.25, #32 Exhibit 2.26, #33 Exhibit 2.27, #34 Exhibit 2.28, #35 Exhibit 2.29, #36 Exhibit 2.30, #37 Exhibit 2.31, #38 Exhibit 2.32) (Newman, Stacy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0978-6041762) by William Witter. (Newman, Stacy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Witter. (Newman, Stacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witter v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Aaron D. Ford
Represented By: Jeffrey M Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden William Gittere
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Jeffrey M Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Witter
Represented By: Stacy M. Newman
Represented By: David S. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?