Camacho v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: Mario Camacho
Respondent: William Gittere and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2020cv00488
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Respondents William Gittere, Nevada Attorney General. Deputy Attorney General Aaron D. Ford-AG terminated. (Stilz, Jaimie)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Mario Camacho (GRANTED and filed per ECF No. #7 Order). (AB)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Mario Camacho (Filed per ECF No. #7 Order). (AB)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Clerk shall separately file the Petition (ECF No. #1 -1) and the Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -2). The Applications to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Nos. #1 and #4 ) are denied. The Court will set a deadline for payment of the filing fee after counsel appears for the Petitioner. Petitioner's Motions for Appointment of Counsel (ECF Nos. #1 -2 and #5 ) are granted. The Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent the Petitioner. Clerk shall electronically serve upon the FPD a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the Petition (ECF No. #1 -1) (Electronic Service on 10/20/2020; Petition attached hereto). FPD will have 30 days from the date of this order to file a notice of appearance or to indicate to the Court its inability to represent the Petitioner in this case. Clerk shall add Aaron Ford, Attorney General, as counsel for Respondents. Clerk shall electronically serve upon the Respondents a copy of the Petition (ECF No. #1 -1) and this order (Electronic Service on 10/20/2020; Petition attached hereto). Respondents will have 30 days from the date of this order to appear in this action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition (ECF No. #1 -1)) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER - Fourth Amended General Order 2012-01 re Mandatory E-Filing for Cases by Inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP (AB)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Mario Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (AB)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Mario Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (AB)
August 31, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER - Fourth Amended General Order 2012-01 re mandatory E-filing for cases by inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP. (LW)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against William Gittere, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:20-cv-00488. (LW)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Mario Camacho. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion for Counsel, #3 Cover Letter) (LW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camacho v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Camacho
Represented By: ESP Law Library
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Gittere
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Jaimie Stilz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Jaimie Stilz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?