Herndon v. Neven et al
Petitioner: Thomas Wray Herndon
Respondent: Dwight Neven and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2020cv00489
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that Petitioner's IFP application (ECF No. 5) is denied. Petitioner must pay the $5.00 filing fee by November 30, 2020. Clerk is directed to mail Petitioner two copies of this order (Two copies instant order attached hereto for distribution to P via LCC law library.) If possible, Petitioner should arrange to have a copy of this order attached to the check for the filing fee. The initial screening of the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. #1 -1), and consideration of Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #4 ) are deferred until such time as Petitioner has fully complied with this order. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 2nd Copy of Order for Plaintiff)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00, receipt number NVRNO005083 (no image attached) (AB)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to Clerk by Thomas Wray Herndon : Brass slip submitted for payment of $5 filing fee. (DRM)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re ECF No. #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Thomas Wray Herndon. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Image re ECF No. #4 has been replaced. NEF regenerated.) (DRM)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER - Fifth Amended General Order 2012-01 re mandatory E-filing for cases by inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP. (DRM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Thomas Wray Herndon. (DRM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Petitioner Thomas Wray Herndon. (DRM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/10/2020) (DRM).
August 31, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER - Fourth Amended General Order 2012-01 re mandatory E-filing for cases by inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP. (DRM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Dwight Neven, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:20-cv-00489. (DRM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for WHC, #2 Cover letter, Envelope) (DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herndon v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Wray Herndon
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?