Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Defendant: Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00517
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Diana Dickinson on behalf of Defendant Keolis Transit America, Inc.. (Dickinson, Diana)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters re #3 Request for Waiver of Service. Keolis Transit America, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by Plaintiff Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany)
September 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keolis Transit America, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6166229) by Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters. Proof of service due by 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keolis Transit America, Inc.
Represented By: Diana Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local Union No. 533, Affiliated with the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Tiffany Lynn Crain Altamirano
Represented By: Kristina L. Hillman
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?