NEXRF Corp. v. Playtika Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: NEXRF Corp.
Defendant: Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika Ltd. and Caesars Interactive Entertainment
Case Number: 3:2020cv00603
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/22/2020. ORDER granting #22 Motion o Accept Verified Petition of Gerson S. Panitch as Submitted re #21 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER approving ECF No. #21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gerson S. Panitch for Playtika Ltd. and Playtika Holding Corp. and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Michael J. McCue. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 21, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Accept Verified Petition of Gerson S. Panitch as Submitted re #21 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika Ltd.. Responses due by 1/4/2021. (McCue, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gerson S. Panitch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. McCue (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6302021) by Defendants Playtika Holding Corp., Playtika Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (McCue, Michael)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting ECF No. #19 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time : All parties have until March 22, 2021 to comply with LR 26-1requirements. (See pdf order for additional specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 14, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Comply with LR 26-1 Requirements re 18 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP,,, by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp.. (Yowell, Adam)
December 10, 2020 Filing 18 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gerson S. Panitch to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/20/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting ECF No. #15 Joint Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Caesars Interactive Entertainment answer due 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. #13 Joint Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Playtika Holding Corp and Playtika Ltd's answers due 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Caesars to Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp.. (Yowell, Adam)
November 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gerson S. Panitch to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/8/2020. (no image attached) (LE)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Playtika Defendants to Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service) (Yowell, Adam)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alastair James Warr on behalf of Plaintiff NEXRF Corp.. (Warr, Alastair)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER approving ECF No. #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alastair J. Warr and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Adam K. Yowell. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/17/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 16, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re ECF No. #3 Summons Issued. Playtika Ltd. served on 11/13/2020. (LW)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Yowell, Adam)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. Attorney Alastair Warr did not attach a recent certificate of good standing as required by the Local Rules. Alastair Warr is advised to attach a recent certificate of good standing to the original petition and to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. (no image attached) (PAV)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alastair Warr and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Adam Yowell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6256315) by Plaintiff NEXRF Corp.. (Yowell, Adam)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Tristin Alishio on behalf of All Defendants served on 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned as to Caesars Interactive Entertainment, #2 Summons Returned as to Playtika Ltd.) (AB)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NEXRF Corp. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate David Stewart, Other Affiliate Lars A. Perry, Other Affiliate Richard Schultz, Other Affiliate Michael Kerr, Other Affiliate Marie Martin for NEXRF Corp. added. (Yowell, Adam)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (AB)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to Playtika Ltd., Playtika Holding Corp., and Caesars Interactive Entertainment. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Playtika Holding Corp., #2 Summons Issued as to Caesars Interactive Entertainment) (AB)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6229215) by NEXRF Corp.. Proof of service due by 1/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - USP 8747229, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - USP 8506406, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - USP 9646454, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - USP 8506407, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - USP 7373116, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Summons - Playtika, #10 Summons Summons - Playtika Holding, #11 Summons Summons - Caesars Interactive) (Yowell, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 26, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEXRF Corp. v. Playtika Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playtika Holding Corp.
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Gerson S. Panitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playtika Ltd.
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Gerson S. Panitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Interactive Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEXRF Corp.
Represented By: Adam K Yowell
Represented By: Alastair James Warr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?