Hudspath v. Olson et al
Petitioner: Melvin M. Hudspath
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Kyle Olson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00638
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) is denied. Petitioner will have 45 days from the date that this order is entered to have the filing fee of $5.00 sent to the Clerk of the Court. Clerk shall send Petitioner two copies of this order (Second copy of order attached hereto for distribution to Petitioner by LCC). Petitioner must make the necessary arrangements to have one copy of this order attached to the check paying the filing fees. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Second Copy of Order for Petitioner)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Melvin M. Hudspath. (Attachments: #1 Cover Note) (KR)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that petitioner must file another application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, accompanied by a signed financial certificate and a statement of his inmate account. The clerk of the court shall send petitioner a blank application form for incarcerated litigants (Sent 11/17/2020 attached hereto). In the alternative, petitioner must make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee of $5.00, accompanied by a copy of this order. Petitioner will have 45 days from the date that this order is entered to comply (1/1/2021). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/16/2020. (IFP Form attached hereto for distribution to P via LCC law library.) (Attachments: #1 IFP form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Kyle Olson, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:20-cv-00638. (LW)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Melvin M. Hudspath. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel, #3 Cover Letter) (LW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudspath v. Olson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin M. Hudspath
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kyle Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?