Schult v. Boy Scouts Of America
Plaintiff: David Keith Schult
Defendant: Boy Scouts Of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00647
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Plaintiff will submit a Complaint to this Court on or before January 19, 2021. Clerk will send Plaintiff the approved 1983 Complaint form, instructions for the same, and a copy of the Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -1) (Attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff by LCC). Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice. Clerk will send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by an inmate, including the information and instructions for the same (Attached hereto for distribution to Plaintiff by LCC). On or before January 19, 2021, Plaintiff will either pay the full $400 filing fee or file with the Court a completed IFP application, a financial certificate, and a copy of the inmate's prison/jail trust fund account statement for the previous six-month period. If Plaintiff does not timely comply with this Order, this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint and Instructions, #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #1 -1)) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 19, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (LE)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER - Fifth Amended General Order 2012-01 re mandatory E-filing for cases by inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP. (LW)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LW)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Keith Schult. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #2 Image of envelope) (LW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schult v. Boy Scouts Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Keith Schult
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?