Rodriguez v. Garrett et al
Petitioner: Evaristo Navarro Rodriguez
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Tim Garrett
Case Number: 3:2020cv00691
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Evaristo Navarro Rodriguez. (Filed pursuant to ECF No. #9 Order. E-service to AG and FPD 1/27/2021.) (DRM)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Petitioner's IFP application (ECF No. #4 ) is denied as moot. Clerk shall detach, file, and e-serve the petition (ECF No. #1 -1) on Respondents. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for Respondents, and provide Respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the Notice of Electronic Filing to the office of the AG only. (NEF's 1-8 regenerated to effect service to AG on 1/27/20201.) Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 5) is granted. FPD is appointed to represent Petitioner. Clerk shall e-serve the FPD a copy of this order, together with a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. #1 -1). (E-service to FPD 1/27/2021; Petition upon subsequent filing.) The FPD has 30 days from the date of entry of this order (2/26/2021) to file a notice of appearance or to indicate to the Court its inability to do so. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER to Judge from Petitioner requesting cited filings be looked at as one. (DRM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2021: #1 Additional copy received) (DRM).
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE and Inmate Account Statement, by Petitioner Evaristo Navarro Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (KR)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER - Fifth Amended General Order 2012-01 re Mandatory E-Filing for Cases by Inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP (AB)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Petitioner Evaristo Navarro Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (AB)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Evaristo Navarro Rodriguez. (See also ECF No. #3 Receipt of Payment) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (AB)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5.00 PAID, receipt number NVRNO-005123. (DRM)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Tim Garrett, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:20-cv-00691. (LW)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Motion for Leave) (LW)
December 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Garrett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evaristo Navarro Rodriguez
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Garrett
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?