United States of America v. Pereos et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pereos 1980 Trust, Iris Norton, Nichole Truax, Teri Morrison, C. Nicholas Pereos, Brownstone Apartments, LLC, Nina Properties II, Inc. and Willis E. Powell
Case Number: 3:2021cv00031
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Willis E. Powell waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Frank, Beth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Pereos 1980 Trust waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Frank, Beth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Nina Properties II, Inc. waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Frank, Beth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Nichole Truax waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Frank, Beth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Teri Morrison waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/10/2021. (Frank, Beth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Iris Norton waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Frank, Beth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Brownstone Apartments, LLC waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Frank, Beth)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. C. Nicholas Pereos waiver sent on 2/5/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. (Frank, Beth)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #2 Motion. Government Attorney, Beth Frank, is admitted to practice in the District of Nevada for the duration of employment by the United States. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/20/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00031-MMD-WGC. (no image attached) (WJ)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL - With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben recuses himself in this action. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to the Chief Judge for reassignment for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Nina Properties II, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to Pereos 1980 Trust, #3 Summons Issued as to Willis E. Powell, #4 Summons Issued as to Nichole Truax, #5 Summons Issued as to Iris Norton, #6 Summons Issued as to Brownstone Apartments, LLC, #7 Summons Issued as to Teri Morrison) (AB)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Beth Frank by Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 1/28/2021. (Vance, Holly)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Proof of service due by 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons) (Vance, Holly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Pereos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pereos 1980 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole Truax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Nicholas Pereos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brownstone Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Properties II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willis E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Represented By: Beth Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?