Meehan et al v. Sisolak et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Chapman, Janine Hansen, Shawn Meehan and Melissa Clement
Defendant: Stephen F. Sisolak, Brenda Erdoes, Aaron Darnell Ford and Nicole Cannizzaro
Case Number: 3:2021cv00100
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER on Mandate as to ECF No. #26 USCA Mandate dismissing the appeal re ECF No. #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Shawn Meehan. USCA Case Number 21-15357. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 1, 2021 Filing 26 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to ECF No. #11 Notice of Appeal, ECF No. #15 USCA Order. USCA case 21-15357. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Stipulation re Service of Process and Motion Briefing Schedule : Defendants Erdose and Cannizzaro have until 4/21/2021 to file: (1) Response to ECF #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) Response to ECF #1 Complaint or, in the alternative file Motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs have until 5/5/2021 to file: (1) Reply to ECF #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and (2) Response to Motion to Dismiss, if Defendants Erdose and Cannizzaro file such motion; Reply due 5/12/2021. Response to ECF No. #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 4/21/2021; Reply due by 5/5/2021. Response to ECF No. #19 Motion to Dismiss due by 5/5/2021; Reply due by 5/12/2021. (See pdf order for additional specifics.)Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 3/31/2021 clarify reply and response dates. per PV (LE).
March 31, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/31/2021. Plaintiff's motion to extend time (ECF No. #22 ) is denied in light of the filing of a stipulation (ECF No. #23 ) to extend time. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 30, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order Regarding Service of Process on Legislative Defendants, Briefing Schedule for Motions, and Related Matters re #1 Complaint,, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #22 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Defendants Nicole Cannizzaro, Brenda Erdoes. (Powers, Kevin)
March 29, 2021 Filing 22 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Legislative Defendants Briefing Schedule re #14 Response by Plaintiff Shawn Meehan. (Chattah, Sigal)
March 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Sisolak and Ford by Shawn Meehan.. (Chattah, Sigal)
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/19/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. As directed by the Court, Defendants Ford and Sisolak separated the response (ECF No. #14 ) from their countermotion to dismiss (ECF No. #19 ). The Court deems the filing date of the countermotion to dismiss (ECF No. #19 ) to be the same date as the response (ECF No. #14 ) -- March 10, 2021. Therefore, any response to the countermotion to dismiss (ECF No. #19 ) is due by by 3/24/2021. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 Counter MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Aaron Darnell Ford, Stephen F. Sisolak. Responses due by 4/2/2021. (Newby, Craig)
March 19, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Meehan. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Chattah, Sigal)
March 19, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/19/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Defendants Ford and Sisolak filed a response (ECF No. #14 ) to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. #6 ) that contains a motion to dismiss for lack of standing. LR IC 2-2(b) states "For each type of relief requested or purpose of the document, a separate document must be filed and a separate event must be selected for that document." Defendants Ford and Sisolak are granted leave to file the motion to dismiss for lack of standing that is contained within their response (ECF No. #14 ) as a separate document. The motion to dismiss must be filed no later than close of business this date. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/2021. The Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals dismissed Plaintiffs' appeal for lack of jurisdiction. (ECF No. 15.) It is therefore ordered that Defendants Nicole Cannizzaro and Brenda Erdoes' motion to stay this case pending the resolution of Plaintiffs' appeal (ECF No. 13) is denied as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Houston, Thad)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to ECF No. #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Shawn Meehan. We dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. USCA Case Number 21-15357. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Aaron Darnell Ford, Stephen F. Sisolak. Replies due by 3/17/2021. (Newby, Craig)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Case re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Nicole Cannizzaro, Brenda Erdoes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Legislative Defendants' Exhibits) (Powers, Kevin)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 USCA ORDER for Time Schedule and docketing letter as to ECF No. #11 Notice of Appeal. USCA case number 21-15357 assigned. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Shawn Meehan. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-6386446. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Chattah, Sigal)
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janine Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Chattah, Sigal)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/25/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. #6 , the "PI" motion.) The normal briefing schedule will apply to the motion because Plaintiffs do not specifically request an expedited briefing schedule in their PI motion and did not otherwise establish they are entitled to an expedited briefing schedule under LR 7-4. The Court will determine whether to set a hearing upon reviewing the subsequent briefs. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 25, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (LE)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/24/2021. This action was filed in the unofficial southern division of the court. However, the complaint indicates that the subject of this litigation is the Nevada Capitol Building in Carson City, Nevada, which is in the unofficial northern division of the court. LR IA 1-6. Under Local Rule IA 1-8(a), civil actions "must be filed in the clerk's office for the unofficial division of the court in which the action allegedly arose." IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is transferred to the unofficial northern division of this court for all further proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer and reopen this matter as a new action under a new docket number in the northern division and CLOSE the action under this docket number, without prejudice to the plaintiffs regarding any federal filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Shawn Meehan. Responses due by 3/10/2021. (Chattah, Sigal)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Shawn Meehan. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Chattah, Sigal)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lynn Chapman that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Chattah, Sigal)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 -1,2,3,4 Proposed Summons. The summons are not properly filled out. Attorney Sigal Chattah advised to properly fill out the summons with the named defendant and also the attorney's information for return of service and file as "Proposed Summons to be Issued" category. (no image attached) (DKJ)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6371991) by Shawn Meehan, Janine Hansen. Proof of service due by 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chattah, Sigal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meehan et al v. Sisolak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen F. Sisolak
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Erdoes
Represented By: Kevin C. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Darnell Ford
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Cannizzaro
Represented By: Kevin C. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Chapman
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Hansen
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Meehan
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Clement
Represented By: Sigal Chattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?