Urban Outfitters, Inc. v. United Construction Co. et al
Plaintiff: Urban Outfitters, Inc.
Defendant: Dermody Operating Company, LLC and United Construction Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00109
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to #20 Response, by Defendant United Construction Co.. (Simons, Mark)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant United Construction Co.. (Simons, Mark)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JOINDER to #23 Reply by Defendant United Construction Co.. (Simons, Mark)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Dermody Operating Company, LLC. (LaForge, Frank)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Urban Outfitters, Inc.. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meeting Assembly Committee April 9, 2019, #2 Exhibit Meeting Senate Committee May 15, 2019) (Walters, Brian)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #12 Motion to Dismiss, #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Urban Outfitters, Inc.. (Walters, Brian)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Urban Outfitters, Inc.. Replies due by 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Meeting Assembly Committee april 9, 2019, #2 Exhibit Meeting Senate Committee May 15, 2019, #3 Declaration of Sean Wagner, #4 Declaration of Brian K. Waltrs, Esq., #5 Exhibit GAF Guarantee) (Walters, Brian)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re Case Management Report. The parties shall meet and confer on items required to be included in the Joint Case Management Report. After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than May 17, 2021. The Case Management Report shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages and shall not include any attached exhibits. Should counsel or a party fail to comply with the directions as set forth in this order, an ex parte hearing may be held and contempt sanctions, including monetary sanctions, dismissal, default, or other appropriate judgment, may be imposed and/or ordered. See PDF image for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINDER to #13 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant United Construction Co.. (Simons, Mark)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JOINDER to #12 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant United Construction Co.. (Simons, Mark)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINDER to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Dermody Operating Company, LLC. (LaForge, Frank)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Request for Judicial Notice by Defendant Dermody Operating Company, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (LaForge, Frank)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #12 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Dermody Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (LaForge, Frank)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Dermody Operating Company, LLC. Responses due by 4/16/2021. (LaForge, Frank)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United Construction Co.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Simons, Mark)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant United Construction Co.. Responses due by 4/16/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/17/2021. (Simons, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dermody Operating Company, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Dermody Operating Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Dermody Properties LLC for Dermody Operating Company, LLC added. (Hippler, Matthew)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Urban Outfitters, Inc.. Dermody Operating Company, LLC served on 3/12/2021. (Schumacher, Robert)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Urban Outfitters, Inc.. United Construction Co. served on 3/12/2021. (Schumacher, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dermody Operating Company, LLC, United Construction Co. re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued SUMMONS (UNITED CONSTRUCTION CO.) by Plaintiff Urban Outfitters, Inc.. (Schumacher, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued SUMMONS (DERMODY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC) by Plaintiff Urban Outfitters, Inc.. (Schumacher, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Urban Outfitters, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schumacher, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dermody Operating Company, LLC, United Construction Co. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6391886) by Urban Outfitters, Inc.. Proof of service due by 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schumacher, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Urban Outfitters, Inc. v. United Construction Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermody Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Frank Z LaForge
Represented By: Matthew B. Hippler
Represented By: Lars K. Evensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Construction Co.
Represented By: Mark G Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Urban Outfitters, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E Schumacher
Represented By: Brian K Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?