Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB doing business as Christina Trust as Trustee for PNPMS Trust I 100
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00153
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Stipulation : JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer/response to Complaint due by Friday, 6/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) and Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., to file a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request) by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Larsen, Kent)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Stipulation : JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer to complaint due by Tuesday, 5/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/3/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Larsen, Kent)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Larsen, Kent)
April 28, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Weber, Katie)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Larsen, Kent)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB added. (Dolembo, John)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John S. Dolembo on behalf of Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Dolembo, John)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. added. (Weber, Katie)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/5/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/20/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Third Judicial District Court, Case Number 21-CV-00161, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6431839) by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Larsen, Kent) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 2, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Represented By: Katie M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB doing business as Christina Trust as Trustee for PNPMS Trust I 100
Represented By: John S. Dolembo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?