Williams v. Nevada Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Terrance Eugene Williams
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2021cv00187
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Inmate by Plaintiff Terrance Eugene Williams. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate) (SMR)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Terrance Eugene Williams. (SMR)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - The Clerk of Court is instructed to MAIL Petitioner (i) a blank form petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 with instructions, and (ii) a blank form Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for incarcerated litigants with instructions.(Both forms sent to P via U.S. Mail on 5/24/2021.) IFP application or $5.00 filing feed due by 6/23/2021. "AMENDED" petition due by 6/23/2021. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER - Fifth Amended General Order 2012-01 re mandatory E-filing for cases by inmates at NNCC, LCC, ESP, and HDSP. Electronic filing of prisoner filings has been implemented. All prisoner filings in all federal cases before this Court, including civil rights and habeas corpus cases, must be filed electronically at those facilities which have implemented electronic filings. (SC)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Nevada Department of Corrections, et al., has been received and assigned case number 3:21-cv-00187-HDM-CLB. (SC)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner, Terrance Eugene Williams. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (SC)
April 21, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Eugene Williams
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?