Daly v. Saul
Plaintiff: Deanne Lynn Daly
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00218
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Motion to Extend Time : Certified administrative record and answer to complaint, due by 9/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Certified Administrative Record and Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Cheung, Allison)
June 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deanne Lynn Daly. Andrew Saul served on 5/18/2021; Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel served on 5/18/2021. (Busani, Raquel)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel by Deanne Lynn Daly. No changes to parties. (Busani, Raquel)
May 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Raquel M Busani on behalf of Plaintiff Deanne Lynn Daly. (Busani, Raquel)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving ECF No. #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for attorney, Raquel M Busani, for Deanne Lynn Daly and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Trevor Hatfield. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/12/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Raquel M. Busani and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Trevor J. Hatfield (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6483925) by Plaintiff Deanne Lynn Daly. (Hatfield, Trevor)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Deanne Lynn Daly. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hatfield, Trevor)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. (SC)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SC)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Raquel M Busani to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/26/2021. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 12, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6482544) by Deanne Lynn Daly. Proof of service due by 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons) (Hatfield, Trevor) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 5/12/2021 (SC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daly v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Lynn Daly
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Represented By: Raquel M Busani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?