Leach Logistics, Inc. v CF USA Global Holdings, LLC
Defendant: CF USA Global Holdings, LLC doing business as The Coffee Cherry Company
Counter Defendant: Leach Logistics, Inc.
Counter Claimant: CF USA Global Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00237
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting ECF No. #28 Stipulation Concerning Electronic Service. The parties are reminded that discovery documents are not to be filed on the docket LR 26-7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/28/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
July 27, 2021 Filing 30 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Prall, Todd)
July 21, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/21/2021. The court has reviewed the case management report ECF No. #27 and it does not appear that an initial case management conference is necessary. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the courts standing order ECF No. #16 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
July 21, 2021 Filing 28 STIPULATION re Discovery of Parties Concerning Electronic Service by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Prall, Todd)
July 21, 2021 Filing 27 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC (Prall, Todd)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting ECF No. #25 Stipulation. The Joint Case Management Report is due by July 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 20, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to file Joint Case Management Report re #17 Order, by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Prall, Todd)
July 19, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #18 Motion to Dismiss by Counter Defendant Leach Logistics, Inc.. (Castronova, Stephen)
July 15, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #18 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC, Counter Claimant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. Replies due by 7/22/2021. (Prall, Todd)
July 15, 2021 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Prall, Todd)
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (SC)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER granting ECF No. #19 Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 12/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
July 14, 2021 Filing 19 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Prall, Todd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Counter Defendant Leach Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 7/15/2021. (Castronova, Stephen)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than July 16, 2021. The Case Management Report shall not exceed fifteen(15) pages and shall not include any attached exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 CIVIL STANDING ORDER - MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/30/2021. On June 9, 2021, the Court ordered Defendant to supplement their response with the identities and citizenship of each member of The Coffee Cherry Company. (ECF No. 12.) Defendant timely filed a response on June 14, 2021. (ECF No. #13 .) The Court, having reviewed Defendant's response, is satisfied that diversity jurisdiction exists in this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
June 23, 2021 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Guinasso, Jason)
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to 12 Minute Order,,,, by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Guinasso, Jason)
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/9/2021. On May 26, 2021, the Court ordered Defendant to show cause as to why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (ECF No. 5.) Defendant timely filed a response, and Plaintiff also filed a response. (ECF Nos. 10, 11.) The Court, having reviewed the parties' responses and accompanying exhibits, finds that the amount in controversy has been met under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). However, it remains unclear to the Court whether the parties are diverse due to the lack of clarity relating to members of The Coffee Cherry Company ("Coffee Cherry"). It is therefore ordered that Defendant must supplement their response with the identities and the state citizenship of each member of Coffee Cherry, which is a subsidiary of CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. Defendant must file the supplemental response within 5 days of this order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #5 Order, by Plaintiff Leach Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice) (Castronova, Stephen)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #5 Order, by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I) (Guinasso, Jason)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Guinasso, Jason)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CF USA Global Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CF USA Global Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent CF GLOBAL HOLDINGS, Other Affiliate CJI ENTITIES, Other Affiliate MERCON VENTURES, SA, Other Affiliate NOHBELL CORPORATION, Other Affiliate NOHBELL INVESTMENT, LLC for CF USA Global Holdings, LLC added. (Guinasso, Jason)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. (Guinasso, Jason)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order, by Plaintiff Leach Logistics, Inc.. (Castronova, Stephen)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Within 15 days from the entry of this Order (6/10/2021), Defendant shall show cause in writing why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/25/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/9/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/8/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CF USA Global Holdings, LLC. filed by CF USA Global Holdings, LLC.(Guinasso, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court in and for the County of Washoe, Case Number CV21-00836, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6498134) by CF USA GLOBAL HOLDINGS, LLC dba The Coffee Cherry Company. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Summons and First Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Guinasso, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 24, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach Logistics, Inc. v CF USA Global Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF USA Global Holdings, LLC doing business as The Coffee Cherry Company
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Represented By: Jason D. Guinasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Leach Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Castronova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CF USA Global Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Represented By: Jason D. Guinasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?