T. v. Douglas County School District
Plaintiff: W. T.
Defendant: Douglas County School District
Case Number: 3:2021cv00242
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff W. T. (Adams, Jean)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The parties shall meet and confer on items required to be included in the Joint Case Management Report. After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than July 31, 2021, as specified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Douglas County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Paul)
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Answer to Complaint in Support of Appeal of Decision of Nevada State Review Officer [20 U.S.C. 1415; 25 U.S.C.C. 1331] filed by Douglas County School District. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/31/2021.(Anderson, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jean Murrell Adams for W.T. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michelle Bumgarner. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/7/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jean Murrell Adams and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michelle Bumgarner (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6513754) by Plaintiff W. T.. (Adams, Jean)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W. T.. Douglas County School District served on 5/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Adams, Jean)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Motion to Appoint Craig and Bettina Phillips as guardian ad litem for petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/1/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem by Plaintiff W. T.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adams, Jean)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Douglas County School District. (SC)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jean Murrell Adams to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/9/2021. (no image attached) (WJ)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by W. T.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Adams, Jean)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas County School District (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6500903) by W. T.. Proof of service due by 8/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Adams, Jean) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. v. Douglas County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County School District
Represented By: Paul J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. T.
Represented By: Jean Murrell Adams
Represented By: Michelle R. Bumgarner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?