Upton v. Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Susana Upton
Defendant: Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00270
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
2 Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd. by Susana Upton. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mausert, Mark)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Hearing held on 7/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Karen Walker; Pla Counsel: Mark Mausert, Esq.; Def Counsel: Jonathan McGuire, Esq.; Court Reporter: Liberty Court Recorder; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Recording start and end times: 9:59:50 a.m. - 10:05:21 a.m.; Courtroom: 2.The court holds today's hearing to discuss Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1 ). The court seals the Complaint (ECF No. 1 ) and directs the Plaintiff's counsel filed an amended complaint using short and plain statement of the claims for relief. The court directs defendant to not file a response to the Complaint (ECF No. 1 ). Mr. McGuire states that Defendant will accept service of the amended complaint electronically. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request); Defendant's answer to Complaint due 8/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd.. (Hall, Anthony)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/24/2021. By Deputy Clerk: Karen Walker.A telephonic Hearing is set for Friday, July 16, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb.Counsel is directed to dial 1-888-557-8511, enter the access code 3599743, and enter the security code 71621, approximately five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. The use of speaker phones and cell phones are prohibited by counsel.The court will address the Complaint (ECF No. 1). IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susana Upton re 1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued. Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd. served on 6/22/2021. (Mausert, Mark)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:21-cv-00270-LRH-WGC. (no image attached) (LE)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Chief Judge for reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd. re ECF No. 1 Complaint. (SC)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Susana Upton that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Corrine Raymond for Susana Upton added. (Mausert, Mark)
June 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (WJ)
June 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upton v. Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute Capital Partners, Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony L. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susana Upton
Represented By: Mark L. Mausert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?