Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC v. Guest Manager, LLC
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Guest Manager, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00271
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark re ECF No. #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (DRM)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. Without Prejudice (Routsong, Keith)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Stipulation to Extend Time : Guest Manager, LLC's answer/response to ECF No. #1 Complaint due by 8/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Routsong, Keith)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (SC)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Guest Manager, LLC re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (SC)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Routsong, Keith)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Routsong, Keith)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 Complaint. Counsel is advised to review LR IC 5-1 and sign his complaint. Re-file the complaint using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 . (no image attached) (LE)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Routsong, Keith)
June 17, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (LE)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6526787) by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons) (Routsong, Keith) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC v. Guest Manager, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guest Manager, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Keith Routsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?