Mancinelli v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Susanne Mancinelli
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00273
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner Of Social Security. (DRM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security by Susanne Mancinelli. (Filed and served pursuant to ECF No. #4 Order.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (DRM) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/11/2021) (DRM).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ECF No. #1 IFP application is GRANTED. The complaint shall PROCEED. Clerk shall FILE the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1). Clerk shall ISSUE summons to Commissioner of Social Security and SERVE Commissioner by mailing via certified mail to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, and, Attorney General of United States as specified herein. (Cert. Mail Nos. 7013-1710-0001-6894-0774 and 7013-1710-0001-6894-0781 respectively.) Clerk shall also ISSUE summons to the U.S. Attorney for District of Nevada deliver the summons and the complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service on U.S. Attorney's Office, Reno. (Order, Summons and Complaint emailed to USM 8/11/2021.) Henceforth, P shall serve D or D's attorney a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 21, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (AF)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Susanne Mancinelli. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Susanne Mancinelli. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons USAG, #6 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal) Modified on 6/21/2021 (AF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancinelli v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Mancinelli
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?