Robinson v. Warden of NNCC
Plaintiff: Kristopher Robinson
Defendant: Warden of NNCC, K. Grimmer and Klien
Case Number: 3:2021cv00303
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kristopher Robinson. (SMR)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE with account statements, by Plaintiff Kristopher Robinson (DRM) NOTE: See ECF No. #1 for IFP Application (pages 1-3) Modified on 8/9/2021 (PR).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. #1 ) is denied without prejudice to file a new fully complete IFP application as detailed herein. Clerk shall send P approved IFP form and instructions. (Attached hereto for distribution to P via LCC law library.) Fully complete IFP application or $402 filing fee due by 9/17/2021. Clerk of the Court will retain the complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP form and Instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE. DISREGARD ENTRY: ADVISORY LETTER to litigant (Attached hereto for distribution by NNCC). (SMR) Modified on 7/16/2021 to denote docketing error. NEF regenerated (SMR).
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KR)
July 16, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (LE)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Kristopher Robinson. NOTE: See ECF No. #5 for Plaintiff's FC and IA (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SMR) Modified on 8/9/2021 (PR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Warden of NNCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Robinson
Represented By: Lovelock Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of NNCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Grimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?