Nevada Press Association v. Daniels et al
Plaintiff: Nevada Press Association
Defendant: Charles Daniels, Steve Sisolak, William A Gittere, State of Nevada ex rel, Does 1-10 Unknown and State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2021cv00317
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to #13 Notice (Other) by Defendants Charles Daniels, William A Gittere, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Shevorski, Steven)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE Regarding Revised Execution Manual by Charles Daniels, William A Gittere, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada re #11 Response. (Shevorski, Steven)
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #2 Ex Parte Motion by Plaintiff Nevada Press Association. (Peterson, Christopher)
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #2 Ex Parte Motion by Defendants Charles Daniels, William A Gittere, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada. Replies due by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Shevorski, Steven)
August 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nevada Press Association re #2 Ex Parte Motion, #1 Complaint,,. All Defendants. (Peterson, Christopher)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven Shevorski on behalf of Defendants Charles Daniels, William A Gittere, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada. (Shevorski, Steven)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #6 Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiff Nevada Press Association. (Peterson, Christopher)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Case reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:17-cv-00317-RFB-CLB. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du, and District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II, on 7/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 3:21-cv-00176 by Plaintiff Nevada Press Association. (Peterson, Christopher)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #1 - 1 Complaint. The coversheet list a related case (3:21-cv-0176-RFB-CLB). Attorney Christopher M. Peterson advised to review and comply with Local Rule LR 42-1 Noticing the Court on Related Cases; Consolidation of Cases. (no image attached) (LE)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charles Daniels, William A Gittere, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada, Aaron Ford re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons.Sisolak, #2 Summons.Gittere, #3 Summons.State of NV, #4 Summons.Ford) (SMR)
July 26, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nevada Press Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Peterson, Christopher)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Nevada Press Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Peterson, Christopher)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6569492) by Nevada Press Association. Proof of service due by 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Charles Daniels, #4 Summons William Gittiere, #5 Summons Sisolak, #6 Summons State of Nevada ex rel, #7 Summons) (Peterson, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevada Press Association v. Daniels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Press Association
Represented By: Christopher Peterson
Represented By: Jennifer B. Shomshor
Represented By: Nicole C. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sisolak
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A Gittere
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?