MP Elko, LLC v. Inka, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MP Elko, LLC
Defendant: Inka, LLC, MDC Restaurants, LLC, Vince Eupierre and Joseph Soraci
Case Number: 3:2021cv00334
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff MP Elko, LLC. Replies due by 10/6/2021. (Stephenson, John)
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff MP Elko, LLC. Responses due by 10/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Stephenson, John)
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Anthony J. DiRaimondo re #13 Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendants Vince Eupierre, Inka, LLC, MDC Restaurants, LLC, Joseph Soraci. (DiRaimondo, Anthony)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Vince Eupierre, Inka, LLC, MDC Restaurants, LLC, Joseph Soraci. (DiRaimondo, Anthony)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Vince Eupierre, Inka, LLC, MDC Restaurants, LLC, Joseph Soraci. (DiRaimondo, Anthony)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff MP Elko, LLC. Replies due by 9/15/2021. (Stephenson, John)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT - The parties shall meet and confer on items required to be included in the Joint Case Management Report. After the meet and confer, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Report by no later than October 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/31/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vince Eupierre, Inka, LLC, MDC Restaurants, LLC, Joseph Soraci. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (DiRaimondo, Anthony)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Vince Eupierre, Inka, LLC, MDC Restaurants, LLC, Joseph Soraci. Responses due by 9/9/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/10/2021. (DiRaimondo, Anthony) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (DRM) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/4/2021) (DRM).
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Defendant Inka, LLC (and all Defendants) by Plaintiff MP Elko, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Joseph Soraci, #2 Summons MDC Restaurants, LLC, #3 Summons Vince Eupierre) (Stephenson, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MP ELKO, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stephenson, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff MP ELKO, LLC. (Stephenson, John)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6580805) by MP ELKO, LLC. Proof of service due by 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Stephenson, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 3, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MP Elko, LLC v. Inka, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MP Elko, LLC
Represented By: John Neil Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inka, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. DiRaimondo
Represented By: David A. Carroll
Represented By: Robert Edward Opdyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDC Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. DiRaimondo
Represented By: David A. Carroll
Represented By: Robert Edward Opdyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Eupierre
Represented By: Anthony J. DiRaimondo
Represented By: David A. Carroll
Represented By: Robert Edward Opdyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Soraci
Represented By: Anthony J. DiRaimondo
Represented By: David A. Carroll
Represented By: Robert Edward Opdyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?